Valerga v. Nursey et al
Plaintiff: |
Demetrio A. Valerga |
Defendant: |
Jim Nursey, Neal Ash and Property Sergant |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv01316 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Delta |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
58
OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING ACTION. The Court ADOPTS the 56 Recommendation for the reasons set forth herein. All claims in this case are DISMISSED for failure to comply with Local Rule 10.1(M). The Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/12/2011.(wjc, )
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER. Ash's 30 Motion to Stay is GRANTED with the limited exception that the plaintiff may serve a subpoena on the Thornton Police Department as described in the Order. The Scheduling Order is VACATED. Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Subpo ena Records is GRANTED IN PART. The plaintiff may serve a deposition subpoena on the Thornton Police Department seeking production of its records of custody for the property that was seized and testimony addressing the identity of all persons who han dled the seized property after Ash signed the Evidence Disposition Form on 10/08/2008. Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Grant Extension of Time is DENIED as moot in view of my decision to vacate the Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/24/2011. (wjc, )
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
27
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/15/10. (msksec, )
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
26
ORDER : re: 23 Tendered Document filed by Demetrio A. Valerga. I will construe the document as a motion for leave to amend, and I will refer to it as the Motion. The Motion is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/10. (bnbcd, )
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
14
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/28/10. (mskcd)
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(wjc, )
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendant Jim Nursey is DISMISSED as a party to this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove Defendant Jim Nursey as a named party to the suit. The only remaining defenadnts are Neal Ash, Detective, and John Doe, Property Sergeant. This case shall be drawn to a district judge adn to a magistrate judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/15/2010. (sah, )
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/05/10. (jjh, )
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
2
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file 1915 motion and complaint with an original signature, re: 1 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/7/10. (gmssl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?