Sample v. City of Sheridan et al
Plaintiff: Ray E. Sample
Defendant: City of Sheridan, Arthur (I) J. Krieger and Arthur J. Krieger
Case Number: 1:2010cv01452
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge William J. Martinez on February 5, 2013: ORDERED: 1) Each side shall have 20 minutes for opening statement and voir dire. ORDERED: 2) Plaintiff shall file by February 12th a new do cument which includes all current stipulations of fact. ORDERED: 3) The designations and objections to the deposition of Michael Copp shall be filed by February 12th. ORDERED: 4) Both sides shall submit an e-mail to chambers listing the ide ntity of all counsel and parties/parties' representatives who will be present at trial. ORDERED: 5) Counsel shall meet face to face to review their Exhibit Lists and shall file by next Wednesday, February 13th, a Revised Exhibit List which re flects to the maximum extent possible stipulations with respect to admissibility and authenticity. ORDERED: 6) No trial briefs shall be filed. ORDERED: 7) The joint oral motion for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is GRANTED. Counsel shall obtain a settlement conference date from Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix's chambers at the conclusion of this hearing. ORDERED: 8) Plaintiff's Amended Motion in Limine 57 is GRANTED IN PART, with respect to the third ground, neither Mr. Taylor nor Mr. Jacobson will be permitted to opine with respect to issues other than the plaintiff's economic losses, and they will not be permitted to testify whether in their opinion his discharge was proper under any law or regulation or City personnel manual. The Court will rule on the remainder of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by way of written order to be issued prior to trial. Hearing concluded.Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (wjmcd, )
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs to Plaintiff; that Defendants counsel, Light, Kelly & Dawes, P.C., shall pay jointly to Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel a total amount of $1,616.50 in attorneys fees and costs, in accordance wit h this Courts prior order on sanctions. Defendants counsel must filed proof of payment with the Court on or before May 31, 2012, to include a statement by counsel that said award has not and will not ever be billed to or collected from Defendants, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/24/2012. (ervsl, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Defendants Motions to Dismiss and in the Alternative Motions for SummaryJudgment ECF Nos. 22 , 23 , are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/13/2012.(ervsl, )
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Plaintiffs Confidential Resolution Discussions Letter (Ex. I, attached to ECF No. 22 , is hereby STRICKEN, and the Clerk of the Court shall SEAL said document by placing a Restriction Level 1 on it; and Sanctions are AWARDED to Plaintiff i n the form of payment by Defendants counsel to Plaintiff of the attorneys fees reasonably incurred by Plaintiff in connection with the filing of his Motion to Strike, in conformity with the provisions of this Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/6/2012. (ervsl, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 32 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/20/2011.(erv, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report Status Report due by 2/25/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (erv, ) (Modified on 2/16/2011 corrected typing error)(erv, ).
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Settlement Conference set for February 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and shall be reset only upon joint motion of the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before February 24, 2011 defense counsel shall file an affidavit complia nt with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3 stating the costs and fees charged to Defendants for the preparation of their Confidential Settlement Statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may object to the reasonableness of the costs and fees listed in defense counsels affidavit within ten days after the affidavit is filed. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/10/2011. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sample v. City of Sheridan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray E. Sample
Represented By: Charles W. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur (I) J. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?