Young v. LaPage et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan Young, Sr.
Defendant: Fran LaPage, Brandt, T. E. Williams, Hightshoe, Lundstrum and Krull
Case Number: 1:2010cv01513
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 FINAL JUDGMENT. re 296 Final Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against the Plaintiff and the action and complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is awarded costs, by Deborah Hansen, Deputy Clerk on 6/4/2014. (dhans, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS re: 290 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/19/2014. (dhans, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 283 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to Present Trial Testimony by Telephone, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/10/2014.(evana, )
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 AMENDED ORDER re: 197 Order, of November 6, 2012; At the February 28, 2014 Final Trial Preparation Conference, Plaintiff Johnathan Young, Sr. Moved to amend the Courts November 6, 2012 Order ECF No. 197 to include a fourth C.D. conta ining audio recording of telephone calls (the Motion). The Court, being sufficiently advised hereby ORDERS as follows: The Plaintiffs oral Motion is GRANTED. The Courts November 6, 2012 Order is AMENDED to include the fourth C.D. As such, the fourt h C.D. shall be retained at the Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) legal office or law library until this civil action is concluded by trial or by stipulation, at which time DOC AR 750- 03 § IV.M.8.a1 shall govern the disposition of the fourth C.D. Mr. Young shall continue to comply with DOC regulations, procedures, and policies regarding access to the law library and fourth C.D., by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/4/2014. (evana, )
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 272 Defendant's Motion to Amend Final Pretrial Order. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent Defendant seeks to move two witnesses from his may call list to his will call list; The Motion is furthe r GRANTED to the extent Defendant seeks to add record custodians Holly Winters and Liz Mestas to his witness list; The Motion is DENIED in all other respects; and As Defendants Final Witness List ECF No. [275-1] lists many of the individuals that the Court has now ruled may not be called at trial, Defendant shall file an amended final witness list no later than March 7, 2014, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2014.(evana, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 AMENDED ORDER Granting in part 262 Plaitiff's Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum filed by Johnathan Young, Sr., 263 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum; by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2013. (evana, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying 258 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. Diane Al-Abduljalil, at this time. Dr. Al-Abduljalil will be permitted to testify, and the Court will decide, either during trial or afterwards, whether her testimony satisfi es the requirements of Rule 702. If it does satisfy those requirements, the Court will then give it whatever amount of weight it deserves. If it does not satisfy the requirements, the Court will then grant Plaintiffs Motion and strike the testimony, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/12/2014.(evana, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/26/13. (cbssec)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(e) for Leave to Reopen Discovery and for Status/Scheduling Conference ECF No. 246 is DENIED to the extent it seeks a status/scheduling conference and GRANTED to the extent it seeks l eave to reopen discovery; Discovery is REOPENED until October 25, 2013 for the purpose of allowing the parties to engage in the discovery requested in the Motion; Discovery due by 10/25/2013; 4-Day Bench Trial set for 3/17/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 801 before Judge William J. Martinez. The Final Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/28/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 801 before Judge William J. Martinez, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/18/2013.(ervsl, )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER the Court concludes that Plaintiff has failed to object in a timely fashion as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 72(a) and Plaintiff has not shown that a specific ruling made by Magistrate Judge Shaffer was ECF No. 220 are OVERRULED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/17/2013. (ervsl, )
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying 220 Mr. Young's "Motion Requesting Recusal of Magistrate Judge and Objection of Decisions Made by Magistrate Judge." By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/27/2013. (cbslc1)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2013. The court GRANTS 208 Motion to Clarify. The court GRANTS 212 Motion for Ruling. The plaintiff has failed to established good cause to have the discovery deadline extended. For this reason, the court DENIES the plaintiff's request to serve a second set of interrogatories. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 AMENDED ORDER re: 199 Order requesting that the Clerk of the Court place this case on the list of cases for which counsel may choose to volunteer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/06/2012. (cbslc1)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2012. The court DENIES 183 Motion for Order. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for November 5, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. Th e court is requiring both Mr. Young and his case manager be on the line for this hearing. Counsel for Defendant shall make arrangements with Plaintiff, or his case manager, to create a conference call and contact the court (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER FOR CLERK OF THE COURT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA granting 158 Mr. Young's request that the court issue a subpoena. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a subpoena to Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 08/03/2012.(wjcsl, )
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2012. The court GRANTS 139 Motion for Leave. The supplemented affidavit(s) must be provided to the plaintiff no later than August 6, 2012. The court GRANTS 143 Motion for Order. The transcript should be provided to the plaintiff no later than July 30, 2012. The court shall allow personal names to be redacted from the transcript. The court DENIES 146 Motion for Order. The court DENIES 149 Motion for Order. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2012. The court DENIES without prejudice 130 Motion for Order. The court DENIES 134 Motion for Order. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/24/2012. This deposition will move forward. The court will treat 128 Mr. Young's STATEMENT Contestment of Deposition by Defense as a motion. The court DENIES 128 MOTION/STATEMENT Contestment of Deposition by Defense. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTING 107 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge in its entirety; Plaintiffs Objections ECF No. 114 to the Magistrate Judges August 15, 2011 Recommendation are OVERRULED Denying 79 Defendants Motion to Dism iss Plaintiffs Constitutional claims against Defendant Brock; Granting 79 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Constitutional claims against Defendant Jaeger; All claims other than Plaintiffs excessive force claim against Defendant Brock are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Defendant Jaeger is DISMISSED as a Party-Defendant to this action; Plaintiffs Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Additional Objections ECF No. 114 is DENIED. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/7/2012.(ervsl, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/16/2011. (erv, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Status Conference was held on 1/7/2011. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, doc # 47 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Defendants' Motion to D ismiss Plaintiff's "Supplemental Pleadings", doc # 60 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's Motion Requesting to Proceed With Supplemental Pleading, doc # 52 , is DENIED. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint on or be fore JANUARY 21, 2011. Defendants are allowed to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Third Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Motion for Request to Appoint Personal Attendance to the Plaintiff's Papers, doc # 57 , is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer.(FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 21 Amended Complaint, filed by Johnathan Young, Sr. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Service of Process Form)(erv, )
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Terry Maketa, Sgt. T.E. Williams, Deputy Lundstrom, Deputy Krull, Lt. Billiard, B. Johnsten, Deputy Jaeger, Deputy Nagle, Sgt. Bowers, Comm. Robert W. King, Deputy Brock, Deputy Klinedist, Lt. Brandt and Comm. Mistretta are dismissed as parties to this action for Plaintiff's failure to allege their personal participation. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/23/2010. (sah, )
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER denying as unnecessary 16 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff has until 09/16/10 to file his Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/02/10.(jjh, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/15/10. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. LaPage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Young, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fran LaPage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hightshoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundstrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?