Lewis et al v. Gleason et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Lewis and Alison Maynard
Defendant: John Gleason, James Coyle, April Seekamp, William Lucero, Mary Mullarkey, Gregory J. Hobbs, Jr., Michael Bender, David R. Lass, Karen Romeo, Thomas W. Ossola, Gilbert Roman, Jerry N. Jones, Gale Miller, Kathleen Tafoya, Wiley Daniel, Victor Boog, Robert Swenson, Bruce E. Anderson, Judith Anderson, Glenn Porzak, Don Knox, Nelson Lane and Circuit Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01850
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE WITH RELATED CASE 09-cv-02052 AND WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. 09-cv-02052 and 10-cv-01850 are consolidated. All future filings shall be made in the lead case 09-cv02052. The 4 Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Boland is va cated. Action to be captioned as set forth in the order. The operative complaints ( 1 Complaint) are stricken without prejudice to being refiled at some point. Status Report due by 4/15/2011 from the plaintiffs. All currently pending motions are denied as moot ( 56 Motion to Dismiss; 56 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 59 Motion for Default Judgment; 65 Motion for Default Judgment; 69 Motion to Dismiss; 70 Motion to Dismiss; 72 Motion to Dismiss; 77 APPEAL OF MAGIS TRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; 82 Motion to Strike; 83 Motion to Strike; 83 Motion for Referral; 85 Motion for Order; 86 Motion for Sanctions; 111 Motion to Dismiss; 113 Motion to Dismiss; 125 Motion for Leave; 130 Motion f or Protective Order; 134 Motion for Protective Order; 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; 149 Motion to Strike; 156 Motion for Order), by Judge John L. Kane on 3/29/11.(gmssl, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 AMENDED TRANSFER ORDER. Matter is transferred to Senior Judge Kane, re: 161 Order, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/24/11. (gmssl, )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/23/2011. (sah, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Under 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), I RECUSE myself from this case. The case SHALL BE REASSIGNED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1B. and F. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/2011. (sah, )
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. In light of Plaintiffs' 95 Notice of Dismissal of Michael Bender, Michael Bender is dismissed as a defendant effective 12/20/10. Caption to be amended, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/31/11. (gmssl, )
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 63 State Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosure and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Determination of Their Motion to Dismiss Based on Absolute Immunity and Other Grounds. Status Conference (Scheduling Conference) 11/16/2010 09:30 AM is VACATED. All discovery and disclosure requirements under Rule 26(a)(1) are STAYED until further Order of Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/8/2010.(mjwcd)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying 54 Pro Se Plaintiff Maynards Notification and Request (Motion) to Clarify. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/22/2010.(erv, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Status Conference for 11/16/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/30/2010. (erv, )
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/24/2010. (sah, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/12/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Gleason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Seekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mullarkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Hobbs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Lass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Ossola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Tafoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Boog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Porzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?