Shrader v. Biddinger et al
Plaintiff: Greg Shrader
Defendant: Alan Biddinger, Earik Beann, Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc, William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Cosmological Economics and Sacred Science Institute
Case Number: 1:2010cv01881
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying as moot 301 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; granting 302 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 306 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 308 Motion for Attorney Fees. Judgment shall enter accordingly. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/13. (kfinn, )
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting 288 Motion for Attorney Fees, granted to the extent that defendants Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc. And Earik Beann shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $46,448.45 and granting 290 Motion for Attorney Fees, granted to the extent that defendants William Bradstreet Stewart, Sacred Science Institute, and Institute of Cosmological Economics, Inc., shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $29,602.50. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/26/12.(mjgsl, )
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The 257 magistrate judge's Recommendation on (1) 98 Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Int'l Inc. and Earik Beann To Dismiss This Matter Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [sic] 12(b)(6), (2) 118 Motion by Defendants William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Cosmological Economics, Inc., and Sacred Science Institute: (1) To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) To Dismiss for Fail ure To State a Claim; (3) To Dismiss for Improper Venue, and (4) for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions, (3) 154 Plaintiff [sic] Request to Clerk of Court for Default in Accordance With F.R.C.P. [sic] 55, (4) 168 Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Tec hnologies Intl Inc. and Earik Beann To Include Wave 59 Technologies Int'l Inc. Owners and Officers in Motion To Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Leave To Amend Answer, and (5) 245 Plaintiff's Motion of Summary of Judgment Against Wave5 9 Technologies Int'l Inc. and Earik Beann, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The objections stated in 261 Plaintiff Greg Shrader [sic] Objections to Magistrate Ruling for Defendants William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Co smological Economics, Inc., and Sacred Science Institute are OVERRULED. The objections stated in 262 Plaintiffs [sic] Written Objections to Magistrate Ruling for Earik Beann, Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc., Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc. [sic], and Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc. Owners and Officers are OVERRULED. The 98 Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Intl Inc. and Earik Beann To Dismiss This Matter Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) is GRANTED. The 118 Motion by Defendants William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Cosmological Economics, Inc., and Sacred Science Institute: (1) To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) To Dismiss for Failure To State a Claim; (3) To Dismiss for Improper Venue, and (4) for Attorn eys' Fees and Sanctions is GRANTED. The 168 Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Int'l Inc. and Earik Beann To Include Wave 59 Technologies Intl Inc. Owners and Officers in Motion To Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Leave To Amen d Answer is GRANTED. Plaintiff [sic] Request to Clerk of Court for Default in Accordance With F.R.C.P. [sic] 55 154 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion of [sic] Summary of Judgment Against Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc. and Earik Beann 245 is DENIED, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/21/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs [sic] Request For Leave of Court to File Amended Written Objections To Defendant Biddinger and Earik Beann, Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc, and Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc Owners and Officers 265 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/12/2012.(sah, )
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER. The Motion of [Former] Defendant Alan Biddinger, M.D. for Entry of Money Judgment for Attorney Fees 150 is granted to the extent that defendant Alan Biddinger, M.D., shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $36,037.50. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/17/2012.(sah, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE ORDER denying 240 Plaitntiff [sic] Motion for Legal Fees in Accordance with F.R.C.P. [sic] Rule 11; denying 241 Plaitntiff [sic] 14th Motion to Object to, Mr. Braun is response of Defendants Earik Beann and Wave9 Technologies Int'l Inc. to Plaintiffs Eight Motion to Object. Mr. Brum Trying to Circumvent the F.R.C.P. Docket No. 238 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/29/2011.(wjc, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE ORDER. The following seventeen (17) motions are denied: 176 , 180 , 190 , 195 , 199 , 206 , 209 , 214 , 217 , 220 , 221 , 224 , 225 , 229 , 230 , 234 and 235 . The Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Intl Inc. And Earik Beann to Withdraw Docket 201 (Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike 199 ) and to Allow Filing of Replacement Response out of Time (Docket No. 204) is granted, and 201 is deemed to be withdrawn. Docket No 202 [Plaitntiff Fifth Motion to Strike. Mr. Braun is misunderstanding the FRCP and misapplying the case law he is citing.Docket no. 201.] is denied as moot. Docket No. 117 is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/22/2011.(sah, )
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER. Plaintiffs Written Objections to Federal Judge Blackburns (sic) Order Docket No. 168 175 filed 6/1/2011, are DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/7/2011. (sah, )
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. Plaintiff [sic] Motion (reconsideration) [sic] of Doctet [sic] 162 Ruling by Federal Judge Blackburn. Plaintiff [sic] Motion To Find the Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc. Owners and Officers in Default, and Default Judgement [sic], for Failing To File an Answer 171 filed 5/24/2011, is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/26/2011.(sah, )
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER. Plaitniff (sic) Motion For Leave of Court To Attach Clerk of Courts Denying Default, and Default Judgement (sic) docket no 155, To Plaintiff Written Objections To 135 Ruling By Magistrate Judge Watanabe, Dening (sic) Plaintiff Motion to Find Wave59 Technologies Intl Owners and Officers in Default, For Failing To File an Answer 164 ; and (2) Plaitniff (sic) Motion Objections To Clerk of Courts Denying Default, and Default Judgement (sic) 155 , To Be Heard, Reviewed at The Same Time as Plaintiff Objections To Magistrate Judges Denying Plaitniff (sic) Request For Default Judgement (sic) Against The Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc. Owners and Officers 165 both filed 5/18/2011 are DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/19/2011.(sah, )
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave of Court 147 is denied as moot. The plaintiff shall forthwith stop mailing to the court motions that he has already filed by facsimile, otherwise sanctions may very well be imposed for failing to comply with the courts orders. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/10/2011.(sah, )
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 140 Notice of Appeal by Greg Shrader, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/06/11. (bjrsl, )
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave of Court 136 and Plaintiff [Plaintiffs] Motion for Leave for Filing Second Answer [Response] toWilliam Bradstreet Stewart, Sacred Science Institute and the Institute of Cosmological Economics Motion to Dismiss 138 are GRANTED. The Plaintiff and the Defendants shall use 12- point font on all future filings with this court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/5/2011.(sah, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER denying 131 Motion to Move Federal Magistrate Judge for Default Judgement [sic] Against Wave 59 Technologies Intl Inc. Owners and Officers, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/3/2011.(mjwcd)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER striking 126 plaintiffs OBJECTIONS TO MOTIONS BYDEFENDANTS WILLIAM BRADSTREET STEWART, INSTITUTE OF COSMOLOGICAL ECONOMICS,INC [sic] AND SACRED SCIECNCE [sic] INSTITUTE: (1) TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; (2) TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; (3) TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE, AND (4) FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND SANCTIONS. PLAINTIFF ALSO MOVES THIS HONORABLE COURT FOR SUMMARY OF JUDGEMENT [sic] AGAINST WILLIAMBRADSTREET STEWART, INSTITUTE OF COSMOLOGICAL ECONOMICS , INC AND SACRED SCIECNED [sic] INSTITUTE AND ATTORNEYS FEES pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(C) (A motion shall not be included in a response or reply to the original motion. A motion shall be made in a separate paper.). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/22/2011.(sah, )
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting 111 plaintiffs Motion to Strike Sentence; denying as moot 113 plaintiff's Motion for Continuance, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/6/2011.(mjwcd)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion by Defendants William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Cosmological Economics, Inc. and Sacred Science Institute to Continue or Vacate Scheduling Conference and Related Dates 90 is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on 3/30/2011 at 8:00 a.m. is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/23/2011.(sah, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 85 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time on Getting Scheduling Order Filed ; denying 87 plaintiff's Motion for Releif [sic] from Illegal Actions of the Defendants in this Case. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/2011.(mjwcd)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER denying 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Stay; denying 80 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time on Getting Scheduling Order Filed, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/10/2011.(wjc, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and Order 66 filed 1/20/2011, is respectfully REJECTED as moot. The Motion of Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Intl, Inc., and Earik Beann To Close Matter Administratively or, in the Alter native, To Stay Proceedings 34 , filed 12/3/2010, is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant Biddingers Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure To State a Claim and for Sanctions and Attorneys [sic] Fees 7 , filed 10/6/2010, is REFERRED to the magistrate judge for further findings. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/8/2011.(sah, )
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER. The Pro Se Plaintiffs Amended Objections to andRequest for Leave to File Amended Objections [sic] Plaintiff Motion of Objections to Defendants Wave 59 Technologies Intl Inc., and Earik Beann to Close Matter Administratively or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings 46 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/8/2011.(sah, )
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion by Plaintiff for United States Marshalls [sic] to Server [sic] William Bradstreet Stewart, Institute of Cosmoloical [sic] Economics and Sacred Science Institute, as set forth in the Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2011.(mjwcd)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Alan Biddingers Second Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Unauthorized Briefs 53 is granted, and thus 49 and 50 are stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/5/2011.(sah, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 12/8/2010. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/27/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deny ing 17 Motion to Be Re-inburesed [sic] for Service of Process to Defendant Earik Beann, Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc, and Wave59 Offiers [sic] and Owners. Parties shall have to and including 12/23/2010 to file any responses to Motion of Defendants Wave59 Technologies Intl Inc. and Earik Beann to Close Matter Administratively or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings 34 . (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying 22 Defendants Wave 59 Technologies and Beann's Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Status conference remains set 12/8/10, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/18/10.(gmssl, )
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Defendant Biddingers Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Determination of Defendant Biddingers Motion Contesting Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) 8 is GRANTED. Discovery is STAYED until further Order of Court. Each p arty shall pay their own attorney fees and costs; and GREG SHRADER. The Status Conference remains set on 12/08/2010, at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Watanabe. The parties shall comply with this courts previous minute order dated 10/05/2010 6 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/29/2010.(sah, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Status Conference set for 10/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/10/2010. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrader v. Biddinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Biddinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earik Beann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wave59 Technologies Int'l Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bradstreet Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institute of Cosmological Economics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacred Science Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?