Peiker Acustic, Inc. et al v. Kennedy
Plaintiff: Peiker Acustic, Inc. and Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG
Defendant: Pat Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2010cv02083
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER for Entry of Amended Final Judgment. Order granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to Amend. An Amended Final Judgment shall enter reflecting the disposition of the Peiker entities' defamation claims in favor of Mr. Kennedy, as well as the jury's verdict against Mr. Kennedy and in favor of Peiker on Mr. Kennedy's counterclaim for abuse of process by Judge John L. Kane on 06/22/12.(jjhsl, )
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER granting 173 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Final Judgment. Reply is due on or before 6/27/12, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/20/12.(gmssl, )
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 168 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 05/31/12.(jjhsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re Motion 165 to Amend Judgment. The Peiker entities' Response to Kennedy's Motion to Amend Final Judgment is due on or before June 5, 2012. If no Response is received as of 9 a.m. on June 6, 2012, I will assume none is forthcoming and will prepare an Amended Final Judgment along the lines discussed above by Judge John L. Kane on 05/29/12. (jjhsl, )
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Nunc Pro Tunc ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice 112 is granted. Their defamation claim against Patrick Kennedy is Dismissed With Prejudice by Judge John L. Kane on 04/04/12. (jjhsl, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS signed by Judge John L. Kane on 4/26/2012. (babia)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane held on 4/4/2012 Granting 112 Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs' defamation claim against Patrick Kennedy is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Court Reporter: Tamara Hoffschildt)(babia)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Exclude Viva R. Moffat, Esq. as Expert Witness, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/21/2012.(wjcsl, )
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Counterclaims 74 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/2012.(sah, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Fifteen (15) day Jury Trial set for 4/16/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/7/11. (rebsec, )
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER denying 46 Defendant's Motion to Modify Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/19/2011.(mjwcd)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. Defendants Motion to Amend Counterclaims 60 is GRANTED. The Defendants Answer, Amended Counterclaims and Jury Demand [60-14] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order; and each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/27/2011.(sah, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 54 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference 5/19/2011 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/2/2011.(mjwcd)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 48 is GRANTED. The parties' deadline for expert disclosures is extended to 4/26/2011, and the deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures is extended to 5/17/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/2011.(sah, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/2/2011. (sah, )
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims 14 is denied. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/02/2010.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peiker Acustic, Inc. et al v. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peiker Acustic, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick A. Acomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG
Represented By: Frederick A. Acomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Kennedy
Represented By: Michael J. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?