Puerta v. RJN Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Puerta
Defendant: Barry Tiggemann, Nam Tiggeman and RJN Partners, LLC
Interested_party: USA
Case Number: 1:2010cv02162
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Upon 81 Notice of Dismissal by both Plaintiff and Defendant, it is ordered that all matters herein be dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall pay their own fees and costs, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/23/12.(lygsl, )
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A four-day Jury Trial is set for 8/27/2012 09:00 AM in Suite 1000 (Colorado Springs) before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 8/10/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 (Denver-Arraj Building) before Judge R. Brooke Jackson, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/16/2012. (rbjsec. )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER: granting 64 Amended Motion for Leave to Join Monte Timmerman as Party Plaintiff. The case caption is modified, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/11.(bnbcd, )
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: denying 61 Motion for Leave to Join Monte Timmerman as Party Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/20/11.(bnbcd, )
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER re: 57 Order, Corrected Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2012 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/14/2011. (erv2, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re: 56 Status Conference, November 18, 2011: Written Discovery Cut- Off ; November 18, 2011: Written Discovery Cut-Off; December 21, 2011: Deadline for Additional Plaintiffs to Opt-In; January 16, 2011: Dispositive Motion Deadline; January 31 , 2012: Deadline to Depose Additional Opt-In Plaintiffs; February 9, 2012, at 8:30 a.m.: Final Pretrial Conference in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed final pretrial order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than February 2, 2012. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/11/2011. (erv2, )
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: denying without prejudice 35 Motion for Leave to Join Luz A. Rael As Party Plaintiff; denying without prejudice 40 Motion for Leave to Join Richard Bulik As Party Plaintiff; denying without prejudice 45 Motion for Leave to Join Drew Dickerson As Party Plaintiff. Status Report due by 9/19/2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/9/11.(bnbcd, )
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/11/11. (bnbcd, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Amend Complaint and Motion to Unseal Action. Plaintiff' voluntary dismissal of the False Claims Act is granted without prejudice to the United States to refile said claim at a later date. United States' ex parte Status Report is to remain sealed. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint and Unseal Action is granted. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is accepted as filed, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/24/11.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puerta v. RJN Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: USA
Represented By: J. Chris Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Tiggemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nam Tiggeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJN Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Puerta
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?