Chimney Rock Public Power District et al v. Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chimney Rock Public Power District, Midwest Electric Cooperative Coporation, Northwest Rural Public Power District, Panhandle Rural Electric Membership Association and Roosevelt Public Power District
Defendant: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. and Harold Thompson
Case Number: 1:2010cv02349
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. against Chimney Rock Public Power District, Midwest Electric Cooperative Coporation, Northwest Rural Public Power District, Panhandle Rural Electric Membership Association, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/13/2014. (dhans, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER For the reasons set forth above, the Court ORDERS that Cobb and Skinners Rule 59 Motion to Amend the Judgment This Court Entered on August 21, 2013 ECF No. 275 and Wayne Cobb and Rolland Skinners Motion for Fees and Costs ECF No. 276 are DENIED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/12/2014.(evana, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/28/2014. (dhans, )
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER (Rulings) on Objections to Deposition Designation, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/13/2014. (evana, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 294 Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen Duree; granting in part and denying in part 295 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of George F. Rhodes, Ph.D., by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/30/2014.(evana, )
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER denying 310 Defendants Motion to Strike Jury Demand as to Plaintiffs Only Remaining Withdrawal Claim Seeking the Equitable Remedy of Restitution By Disgorgement; and The 5-Day Jury Trial set to begin on May 19, 2014 in this case is hereby VACATED and RESET for a 7-Day Jury Trial to begin on May 19, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom A801. No trial proceedings will be held on May 26, 2014, which is a Court holiday. The Final Trial Preparation Conference remains set for May 1, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/28/2014.(evana, )
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 320 Defendants Motion in Limine, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/21/2014.(evana, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting 312 the Joint Motion for Dismissal of Defendant Tri-States Four Remaining Counterclaims as Moot. Tri-States First through Fourth Counterlcaims against Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court defers ruling on whether to award costs to Plaintiffs or Defendant Tri- State until all of the claims between them have been resolved, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/28/2014.(evana, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER The Third-Party Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 194 & 197 as to Tri-States Fifth Counterclaim against Underwood and Tri-States Sixth Counterclaim against Reiber are GRANTED; Judgment shall enter in favor of Underwood and Reiber; and This action remains pending as to Tri-States Counterclaims against Chimney Rock, Midwest, Northwest, and PREMA, and Plaintiffs Claim 4 against Tri-State. The Third-Party Defendants shall have their costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/3/2014.(evana, )
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Tri-States Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 195 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Tri-States Motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs Rate Claims, and Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant on Plaintiffs Claims 1 and 2; Tr i-States Motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs Withdrawal Claim; Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 192 is DENIED AS MOOT; and This action remains pending as to Plaintiffs Claim 4 against Tri-State, Tri-States Counterc laims against Plaintiffs, and Tri-States Third-Party Claims against Ryan Reiber and Jerry Underwood, which are the subject of a pending Motion for Summary Judgment by the Third-Party Defendants, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2014.(evana, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER that Tri-States Motion to Strike Underwoods and Reibers Right to Petition Defense ECF No. 271 is GRANTED, and the affirmative defense based on the First Amendment Right to Petition is hereby STRICKEN from the Answers filed by Ryan Reiber ECF No. 259 and Jerry Underwood ECF No. 260 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/24/2013.(ervsl, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 266 Defendant Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. (Tri-State)s Motion to Amend the Final Pretrial Order. Tri-State shall prepare a proposed Amended Final Pretrial Order and circulate the same to all parties for approval as to form consistent with this Order. The approved proposed Amended Final Pretrial Order shall be filed on or before November 4, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/17/2013.(ervsl, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER The Third-Party Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ECF Nos. 113 & 117 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; The Motions are GRANTED with respect to Tri-States Fifth Counterclaim against Cobb and Tri-States Sixth Counterclaim against Skinner, and all claims against Cobb and Skinner are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to governmental immunity; The Motions are DENIED in all other respects; and Tri-States Counterclaim action remains pending against Third- Party Defendants Underwood and Reiber, and against Counterclaim Defendants Chimney Rock, Midwest, Northwest, and PREMA. The parties shall bear their own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/21/2013.(ervsl, )
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 COURTROOM MINUTES for Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant Tri-State's Motion to Compel 185 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as stated on record. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant Tri-State's Motion to Compel 185 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs are directed to file, under Restriction Level 3, do cuments 2, 50, 55, 56, 57, 59, 69, 81, 82, 84, 90, 92, 93, 94, 102, 116, 117, 130, 133, 136, 137, 150, 153, 154, 156, 158, 163, 227, 231, 264, 278, 429, and 430 as identified on Plaintiffs' Privilege Log, unredacted, by close of business on July 12, 2013 for in camera review. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Cobb and Underwoods Motion to Compel. Regarding in camera reviewed Doc. Nos. IC001 - IC080: The Motion is GRANTED as to Documents No. IC013, IC014 and IC015. Tri-State shall produce these three documents to Cobb and Underwood on or before May 17, 2013. The Motion is DENIED as to all remaining documents, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/13/2013.(ervsl, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 142 The Joint Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Party Harold Thompson. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., Defendant Harold Hub Thompson is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 3. Plaintiffs Fifth and Sixth Claims for Relief against Mr. Thompson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/19/2013.(ervsl, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The Clerk is directed to file the Amended Answer [93-1], by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/5/12.(sgrim)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 65 Defendant Tri-States Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to Assert Additional Counterclaims; and, granting 81 the Unopposed Motion by Defendant Tri-State to Amend Its Answer to Assert an Additional Defense. Defendant Tri-State shall file its combined amended answer and counterclaims no later than December 3, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2012.(ervsl, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2012, granting 49 Motion to Quash. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (kmtcd)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re: 44 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc.; Plaintiff Roosevelts Complaint in this civil action, and all claims and causes of action Roosevelt has asserted against Defendants Tri-State, Thompson, Harold Hub Thompson, Brian Schlagel, James Jimmy Bason, Jack Hammond, Tom Holgerson, Thain Michie and Charles Jim Soehner, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Tri-States Counterclaims against Roosevelt in this civil action, and all claims and causes of action Tri- State has asserted against Roosevelt are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Tri-States Counterclaims against Plaintiffs other than Roosevelt are unaffected by this Order and shall remain pending, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/29/2012. (ervsl, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER In light of Judge Martinez's Order regarding the Motion to Dismiss, the stay in this matter is LIFTED. Denying as moot 26 Motion for Discovery. Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/11/2012.(ervsl, ) (Modified on 1/11/2012 corrected typing error) (ervsl, ).
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 6 Motion to Stay. Discovery is STAYED in this matterpending ruling on the pending motions to dismiss. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/2011.(erv, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file2011, a Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2011. (erv, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/23/10. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chimney Rock Public Power District et al v. Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimney Rock Public Power District
Represented By: Raymond Leslie Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Electric Cooperative Coporation
Represented By: Raymond Leslie Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Rural Public Power District
Represented By: Raymond Leslie Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Rural Electric Membership Association
Represented By: Raymond Leslie Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Public Power District
Represented By: Raymond Leslie Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Thompson
Represented By: Eric Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?