Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Western Trading Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Western Trading Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02387
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER granting 183 the Joint Motion to Set Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/30/2013. (mehcd)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CONSENT DECREE by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/1/2013. (ervsl, )
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Plaintiff EEOCs Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 to exclude the Opinions of Donna Ferris and Richard Hughes ECF No. 88 is DENIED, Judge William J. Martinez on 2/19/2013.(ervsl, )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 64 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment in its enttirety, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/27/2012.(ervsl, )
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Depositions of Experts, filed with the Court on September 7, 2011, is GRANTED up to and including October 14, 2011, for the sole purpose of conducting the depositions of Dr. Reiley and Dr. Hughes. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/8/2011.(erv, )
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2011.granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Protective Order. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall fully respond to Plaintiff EEOC's Request for Production No. 14, on or before 9/7/2011, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/22/2011.(mjwcd)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2011. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/11/2011.(erv, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Allow the Deposition of Tiffany East After the Discovery Cut-Off. EEOC to take Ms. East's deposition any time on or before 9/15/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/15/2011.(mjwcd)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Depositions of Expert Witnesses. Scheduling Order 11 is amended, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/6/2011.(mjwcd)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Experts.The deadline to complete discovery is extended to 8/15/2011, for the limited purpose of completing any rebuttal expert depositions only. All other discovery shall be completed by 7/15/2011, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/5/11.(lsw, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/2011. (sah, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2011 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/16/2011. (mehcd)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/2/2011. (mehcd)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Disclosure. Any party wishing to suggest his recusal may do so within 10 days, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/22/11. (gmssl, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/11. (gmssl, )
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference reset for 3/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/1/2011. (mehcd)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERREGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/14/10. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Western Trading Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Sean William Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Trading Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?