A.H. et al v. Evenflo Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: A.H. and Tony Hadjih
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02435
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 261 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/15/15. (kpreu)
November 19, 2015 244 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Trial Preparation Conference held on 11/19/2015. Conference concluded. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (dhans, )
August 30, 2013 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 186 Motion for New Trial. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/30/13. (alvsl)
October 31, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion in Limine, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/31/12. (alvsl)
May 31, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 116 Order on Motion for In Camera Inspection. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/31/2012. (sahsl, )
December 8, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A two-week Jury Trial is set for 11/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 10/19/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/8/2011. (rbjsec. )
December 1, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set ascheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 30 days after all service of this Order. Please see the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/1/2011. (rbjsec. )
August 23, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' First Motion to Compel Discovery with Memorandum in Support and Request for Hearing, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/23/2011.(wjc, )
August 10, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 11/28/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/10/2011. (wjc, )
January 10, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/10/11. (msksec, )
October 25, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/25/10. (mskcd)
October 22, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/10/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/22/2010. (wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.H. et al v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.H.
Represented By: William C. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hadjih
Represented By: William C. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?