January 24, 2017 |
Filing
325
ORDER granting 322 Motion to Vacate 312 Judgment on Attorney Fees by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/24/2017. (cthom, )
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
286
ORDER DENYING Defendant's Post-Trial Motions Under Rules 50(b) and 59; denying 267 Motion for Judgment; denying 275 Motion for New Trial, by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/24/2015.(cthom, )
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
273
ORDER granting 271 Unopposed Motion to Approve Bond and Stay Execution of Judgment. The Court APPROVES the bond submitted with the Motion (ECF No. 271-1) and STAYS the execution of the Judgment through and until such times as all post-trial motions, and any appeals in this matter, are resolved. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2015.(alowe) Modified signature date on 2/27/2015 (alowe).
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing
262
ORDER granting 261 Stipulated Motion to Stay of Time for Plaintiff Regency to File Rule 54(d)(1) Bill of Costs and Rule 54(d)(2) Motion for Statutory Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees Under 15 U.S.C. §15(a) . Plaintiff shall hav e until 14 days after the Court rules on Defendant's forthcoming post-trial motions within which to file its bill of costs and its motion for attorney's fees and related non-taxable expenses. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/5/2015. (alowe)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
260
AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. The Judgment is amended to reflect the following: It is FURTHER ORDERED that post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of 0.17% per annum from the date of entry of Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/3/2015. (dhans, )
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
257
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/28/2015. (dhans, )
|
January 26, 2015 |
Filing
243
RULINGS ON OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS: Portions of Dr. Frank Sanchez's deposition designations are SUSTAINED. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/26/2015. (alowe)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
233
RULINGS ON OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS re: 224 Counter-Designation and Objections of Thomas Abrahamson Deposition Testimony. Portions of Mr. Thomas Abrahamson's deposition designation should be redacted from the parties' presentations. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/15/2015. (alowe)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
223
ORDER denying 197 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Introduction of Evidence Relating to Uncharged Tying Arrangement. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/9/2015.(alowe)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
222
MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference held on 1/6/2015. ORDERED: 1. Defendant Campus Village Apartments, LLC's Motion to Permit Testimony at Trial of Witness Not Previously Listed on Final Witness List 195 is DENIED. ORDERED: 2. Plain tiff Regency's Motion In Limine to Preclude Introduction of Evidence Relating to Uncharged Tying Arrangement 197 is not ripe; and therefore, HELD IN ABEYANCE. ORDERED: 3. Plaintiff Regency's Motion for Juror Questionnaire to be Submitted to Jury Array 199 is DENIED. ORDERED: 4. Plaintiff Regency's Motion to Amend Final Pretrial Order in Certain Limited Respects 206 IS DENIED as to the combination issue. Plaintiff will not be permitted to add the word "combination&quo t; to its Jury Instructions or other papers.Counsel shall meet and confer in an effort to stipulate to Further Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms; and shall file by January 13, 2015 their Amended Final Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to the clarification of the parties to the conspiracy, and clarification of the content of the state law interference claim. ORDERED: 5. Each side will have 20 minutes for opening statements. ORDERED: 6. Counsel shall me et and confer to reach additional stipulations on exhibits, and make another effort to stipulate, to the greatest extent possible, to both authenticity and admissibility, including the subsets referred to today. The defense shall eliminate the " ;Dep. Exh." column from its Exhibit List. The parties shall file Amended Exhibit Lists by Wednesday, January 14, 2015. ORDERED: 7. The defense shall notify the Court by January 14, 2015 whether Frank Sanchez will be testifying in person o r by deposition. ORDERED: 8. The parties shall send an email to chambers by the end of this week with a list of the names of all persons who will be seated at counsel tables for the trial. ORDERED: 9. Counsel shall be present at 8:30 a.m. on Tu esday, January 20th to address any pretrial matters. The Court will also address the proposed voir dire questions at that time. ORDERED: 10. The parties shall file by Tuesday, January 13th, a stipulated statement of the case. If a stipulation c annot be reached, each side shall file its statement of the case and the Court will combine them and decide what is going to be read to the jurors. ORDERED: 11. No trial briefs will be accepted. Conference concluded. Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (dhans, )
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
219
ORDER denying 178 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Initial Expert Report; granting 180 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report. The Supplemental Expert Report of Stephen D. Silberman, Ph.D. (ECF No. 181-4) is hereby STRICKEN. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/5/2015. (alowe)
|
October 1, 2014 |
Filing
177
ORDER denying 171 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/1/2014.(evana, )
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
173
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Defendants Motion to Strike the Rebuttal Report on Damages by Dr. Owen R. Phillips and Exclude the Opinions Expressed in that Report; granting in part and denying in part 132 Defendants Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Gregory B. Taylor Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702; granting in part and denying in part 134 Defendants Motion to Exclude the Economic Report of Owen R. Phillips, Ph.D and the Supplemental Economic Report of Owen R. Phillips, Ph.D Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/17/2014.(evana, )
|
September 8, 2014 |
Filing
170
ORDER denying 137 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/8/2014.(evana, )
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
167
ORDER that Defendants Motion [#52] is GRANTED and Plaintiffs Motion 159 is DENIED. Accordingly, Plaintiff is prohibited from utilizing at trial the following witnesses listed in the Final Pretrial Order 151 : (1) Karen Ewertz, (2) Sara Ewertz, ( 3) Daniel Genet, Esq., (4) Leonard A. Martinez, Esq., (5) Rick Masterson, (6) Ryan Masterson, (7) Jessica Saraney, (8) Ciera Springer, (9) Erin Trinka, (10) Shelby Tucker, (11) Barbara Edwards, (12) Cassandra Hill, and (13) Daniel G. Hill, D.D.S., by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/2014.(evana, )
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
136
ORDER denying 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/22/14.(dkals, )
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
127
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/9/14. (lag)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE pending disposition by the Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit of the Interlocutory Appeal. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or final disposition of this case in this Court. Any party may move this Court to reopen this matter for good cause shown after issuance by the Tenth Circuit of its Mandate on the subject appeal, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/27/2012. (ervsl, )
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER denying 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibits A-D to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/23/2011.(wjc, )
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Stay; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further proceedings in this case are STAYED pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss 23 . If necessary, the Court will set a new scheduling conference upon resolution of the Motion to Dismiss. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2011.(ervsl, )
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2011. (erv, )
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
18
MINUTE ORDER. The Stipulation of Parties to Filing of Amended Complaint 15 is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint [15-1] on or before 3/3/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/7/2011.(sah, )
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing
11
MINUTE ORDER. The parties Joint Motion to Vacate Temporarily the Scheduling/Planning Conference Order 9 is GRANTED IN PART. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2010 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and RESET to 03/21/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/10/2010.(sah, )
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
2
ORDER directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/27/2010. (sah, )
|