Hill v. Proctor et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Hill
Defendant: Joseph D. Hoy, Bradley Rosenbauer, Bradley (I) Rosenbauer, Alex Iacovetto, Alex (I) Iacovetto, David K. Proctor, Eagle County Sheriff's Department, Joseph (I) D. Hoy, David (I) K. Proctor and Eagle County, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2010cv02611
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Stipulated Motion to Dismiss the Civil Action with Prejudice pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Civil Action is hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge David M. Ebel on 3/16/2011. (sah, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss the Individual Defendants with Prejudice 45 is GRANTED. Defendants David K. Proctor, Bradley Rosenbauer, AlexIacovetto, and Joseph D. Hoy ARE HEREBY DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION in theirindividual and official capacities WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge David M. Ebel on 3/4/2011.(sah, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. On or before 3/21/2011, the parties shall file a stipulation ormotion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/28/2011. (sah, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint 18 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/2010.(sah, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/5/10. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Proctor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Rosenbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley (I) Rosenbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Iacovetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex (I) Iacovetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph (I) D. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) K. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hill
Represented By: Randall John Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?