Oilman International, FZCO v. Neer et al
Plaintiff: Oilman International, FZCO
Defendant: Marvin Bruce Neer and Jesusa S. Neer
Case Number: 1:2010cv02810
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 161 Order, by Clerk on 4/10/2014. (klyon, )
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. The 139 unopposed motion for entry of final judgment against defendant Marvin Bruce Neer is granted. Final judgment shall enter in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Marvin Bruce Neer in the amount of $462,550.00 plus pre-judgme nt interest from January 11, 2009 to the date of entry of judgment pursuant to Colo. Rev. Stat. § 5-12-102(1)(b) at a rate of 8% per annum compounded annually plus post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Plaintiff may have its costs upon compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. This case shall be closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/12.(mnfsl, )
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JESUSA S. NEER. The 138 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss All Claims of Plaintiff Against Jesusa Neer Only is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims against defendant Jesusa Neer only are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its or her own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/1/12.(mnfsl, )
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 131 unopposed motion to dismiss its tenth and eleventh causes of action against defendant Marvin Bruce Neer is granted. Plaintiff's tenth and eleventh causes of action are dismissed as to defendant Marvin Bruce Neer. The 132 second motion for extension of time to file proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, and orders is granted. The parties shall have until 11:59 PM on Friday, 7/27/2012, to file proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, and orders. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/25/12.(mnfsl, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. The 115 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Plaintiff's 105 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot with respect to all claims against Marvin Neer other than the claims for fraudulent conveyance and imposition of a constructive trust and denied in all other respects. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/12/12.(mnfsl, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. The 106 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted in part. Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) is granted in part and denied in part. Upon entry of final judgment in this cas e, default judgment shall be entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Marvin Bruce Neer in the amount of $462,550. Plaintiff's claim for civil theft against defendant Marvin Bruce Neer is dismissed. Defendant Marvin Bruce Neer shall be precluded from introducing any evidence in defense of plaintiff's claims of fraudulent conveyance and imposition of a constructive trust or equitable lien. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/11/12.(mnfsl, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. The 84 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted in part and rejected in part. Plaintiff's 64 motion for partial summary judgment is denied without prejudice. Defendant Jesusa S. Neer's 77 motion for partial summary is granted in part and held in abeyance in part. Upon entry of final judgment in this case, judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiff on plaintiff's civil conspiracy claim. Within 21 days of entry of this order, plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment in which it elects its remedies and addresses the potential implications of Colorado's economic loss rule.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/12.(mnfsl, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Four-day Bench Trial set for 8/6/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/17/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/23/12. (mnfsl, )
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER; granting in part and denying in part 87 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Final Pre-Trial Conference and the Deadline to File the Proposed Final Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/20/11.(bnbcd, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Unopposed First Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and Extend the Deadline to File the Proposed Final Pre-Trial Order. The Final Pre-trial Conference set for 12/15/2011 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/28/11.(mnfsl, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER accepting 58 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The 13 Motion to Dismiss and Remove Jesusa S. Neer From Civil Action is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/23/11.(mnf, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: granting 61 Plaintiffs Motion to Exceed Page Limitations for Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has leave to submit a motion for summary judgment that does not exceed twenty-four pages, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/9/11.(bnbcd, )
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall accept for filing the Amended Complaint [Doc. # 52-1]. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/11.(mnfsl, )
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: denying without prejudice 49 Motion to Amend the complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/17/11.(bnbcd, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. The 36 Order to Show Cause is discharged, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/17/11. (mnf, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Plaintiff's 40 Unopposed Motion to Conduct Telephone Depositions Pursuant to Stipulation under Fed.R.Civ.P. 29(a) and 30(b)(4) is granted and the Court adopts the stipulation entered by the parties, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/15/11.(mnf, )
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: denying 29 Request Time to find a lawyer. The scheduling conference will proceed on January 27, 2011, at 2:00 p.m., as previously set. The defendants may appear at the scheduling conference by telephone by contacting the court at 303-844-6408 at the appropriate date and time, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/20/11.(bnbcd, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/15/10. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oilman International, FZCO v. Neer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oilman International, FZCO
Represented By: Sean Patrick Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Bruce Neer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesusa S. Neer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?