Carbajal v. Warner et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Carbajal and Dean Carbajal
Defendant: Seventh Judicial District, Delta County Board of County Commissioners, Montrose County Board of County Commissioners, Gunnison County Board of County Commissioners, Mandy Allen, Steven Patrick, James Schum, Charles Greenacre, Sandra Miller, Jeff Herron, Myrl Serra, Sherri Price, Kramer, City of Delta, The, Montrose Probation Department, Delta Probation Department, Carrol Warner, David Romero, Joe Quintana, Adams County Probation Department, Adams County Board of County Commissioners, Beth Valerio, Delta Sheriff Department, Bill Railey, Chris Weldon, Hatch, B. Wolfe, B. Shroeder, City of Denver, Denver Police Department, Denver Chief of Police, Gilberto Lucio, Colorado Department of Corrections, City of Westminster, The, Westminster Police Department, Westminster Chief of Police, City of Arvada, Arvada Police Department, Arvada Chief of Police, Patrick Meester, A. J. DeAndrea, Jourdan Lopez-Basgall, Mandy (I) Allen, Steven (I) Patrick, James (I) Schum, Charles (I) Greenacre, Sandra (I) Miller, Jeff (I) Herron, Myrl (I) Serra, Sherri (I) Price, (I) Kramer, Carrol (I) Warner, David (I) Romero, Joe (I) Quintana, Beth (I) Valerio, Bill (I) Railey, Chris (I) Weldon, (I) Hatch, B. (I) Wolfe, B. (I) Shroeder, Gilberto (I) Lucio, Patrick (I) Meester, A. (I) J. DeAndrea and Jourdan (I) Lopez-Basgall
Case Number: 1:2010cv02862
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Montrose
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1016 Motion to Revive Motion for Transcripts (Docket No. 995) and Request for Transcripts. The plaintiff shall be provided copies of the trial transcripts at government expense pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 753(f). ORDERED by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/6/2019.(cthom, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/9/2019, re: 967 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 is DENIED; 1001 plaintiff's Motion for a Progression Order is DENIED as moot. (sphil, )
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER denying 905 Notice to Court of Fraud and Motion to Reopen Case Against State Defendants by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/28/17. (dkals, )
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER. ORDERED that Mr. Carbajals Contemporaneous Objection to the Courts Order [# 902] Denying Advancement of Witness Fees Without the Proper Consideration for its Inherent Authority and Rule 614(a) and 706(b) Fed. R. Evid. 920 , construed as a motion for reconsideration, is denied. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/19/17. (jhawk, )
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER. ORDERED that the Denver Defendants' Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Trial Witness Chris Maurez 896 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/08/17. (jhawk, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER. Plaintiff Dean Carbajal's Motion for Change of Judge Based on the Recent Discovery of Judge Philip Brimmer's Extrajudicial Bias 904 is denied. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/01/17. (jhawk, )
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Contemporaneous Objection to the Court's Intentional Violation of his First and Fourteenth Amendment Rights 899 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursu ant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 900 is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall issue trial subpoenas for the date the trial is reset. The United States Marshals Service for the District of Colorado shall serve the subpoenas issued herein. The witness fees, mileage and subsistence of said witnesses shall be paid by plaintiff Dean Carbajal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/4/17. (pabsec)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion for an Order Directing the Clerk of Court to Stamp the Attached Subpoenas and the Marshals to Effectuate Service 869 is denied without prejudice. The Court will reconsider the issue upon Mr. Carbajal's tender of witness fees and mileage. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/19/16. (jhawk, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER. ORDERED that the Denver defendants' Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Designations 855 is granted. ORDERED that Dan Montgomery, Charlie Garcia, Al LaCabe, and Perry Speelman are struck from plaintiff's list of expert witnesses, se e Docket Nos. 853 , 873 , and plaintiff is precluded from calling them as experts. ORDERED that the Denver defendants Motion in Limine 868 is granted in part. ORDERED that plaintiff is precluded from calling Angela Hunt, David Cooperstein, Darin Desel, Charlie Garcia, Robert White, Gerald Whitman, Dan Montgomery, and Andrew Keefer. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/16/16. (jhawk, )
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff Dean Carbajal's Motion to Reconsider the Court's Abusive and Unfair Denial of Extensions of Time and Improper Grant of Summary Based on the Fraudulent Misrepresentation of Facts and Concealment of Material Evidence Supporting Liability 811 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/14/16. (jhawk, )
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER. ORDERED that defendant Jeffrey Watts' Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Order Dated March 29, 2016 from Defendant Watts 809 is granted in part and denied in part. ORDERED that defendant Jeffrey Watts is granted summary judgment on plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim of excessive force. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/13/16. (jhawk, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 783 is ACCEPTED in part and REJECTED in part as reflected in this Order. ORDERED that defendants Carrol Warner, David Romero, and Joe Quintana's Motion for Summary Judgme nt 694 is GRANTED. ORDERED that defendant Jeffrey Watts Motion for Summary Judgment 697 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as reflected in this Order. ORDERED that defendants Adam Barrett, Darin Desel, James Dixon, Jay Lopez, Gilberto Lucio, Michael O'Neill, Jesse Rembert, Joel Smith, Perry Speelman, and the City and County of Denver's Motion for Summary Judgment 700 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as reflected in this Order. ORDERED that defendants Bill Railey, Chris W eldon, Benjamin Schroeder, and Fred McKee's Motion for Summary Judgment 714 is GRANTED. ORDERED that defendants Carrol Warner, David Romero, Joe Quintana, Adam Barrett, Darin Desel, Jay Lopez, Jesse Rembert, Joel Smith, Perry Speelman, the Cityand County of Denver, Bill Railey, Chris Weldon, Benjamin Schroeder, and Fred McKee are dismissed from this lawsuit by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/29/16.(jhawk, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/29/16. Motion for Attorney Fees Incurred in Responding to Plaintiff's Motion # 756 is GRANTED.(lgale, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MINUTE ORDER granting 759 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Their Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2015. ORDERED that 755 Response to Motion and 761 Exhibits are STRICKEN. (slibi, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER; 653 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production and/or Entry of a Contempt Order is DENIED as moot. 659 Plaintiffs AmendedMotion for Leave to Have a Legal Box For Each of Plaintiffs Cases That He IsPresently Litigating Pro Se is DENIED witho ut prejudice. 731 Plaintiffs Motion to Open Discovery is DENIED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. 733 Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions and Emergency Hearing is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants request to seek an award o f attorneysfees and costs is GRANTED. Any such motion and supporting documentation shall be filed on or before December 8, 2015. 740 Plaintiffs Third Motion forExtension of Time is DENIED in part and DENIED as moot in part. 741 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Summary Judgment Proceedings Pending [sic] is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/15.(morti, )
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/21/15. Motion for Protective Order # 663 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Discovery due by 8/4/2015. (lgale, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 711 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/20/15. # 672 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (lgale, )
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER; 661 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Subpoena to Produce Documents Directed at Sprint Telecommunications is GRANTED. The subpoena isquashed. Nonparty Sprint Telecommunications shall not produce documents in response to Plaintiffs subpoena served on it on June 11, 2013. See Proof of Service 536 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/15.(morti, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER: Denver Defendants' and Defendant Watts' Motions to Reassert [# 645 , # 647 ] are GRANTED. Defendant Watts' Motion for Protective Order [# 498 ] is DENIED. Denver Defendants' Motions to Quash [# 504 , # 505 ] are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Motion [# 649 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/28/2015.(alowe)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/15. Motion for Leave to Have a Legal Box for Each of the Plaintiff's Cases That Are Presently being Litigated [# 631 ] is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 636 MINUTE ORDER granting 634 Motion for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 3/5/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Plaintiff's 630 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Deadlines is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/20/2015.(alowe)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MINUTE ORDER granting 624 Motion to Strike [First] Motion to Withdraw; granting 620 [Second] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Runyan Allen terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/2014.(alowe)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting 617 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Edward Gruninger, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/22/2014.(alowe)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 613 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/5/14. Joint Motion to Exceed Seven (7) Hours for Taking Plaintiff's Deposition 611 is GRANTED.(lgale)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 608 Motion For a Progression Order Compelling the Reopening of This Action, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/1/2014.(trlee, )
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER Reopening Case and Staying Proceedings. Motion to Reopen Case 604 is Granted. Motion to Reopen Case 605 is Denied as Moot. The clerk is DIRECTED to reopen this civil action by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/17/14.(jhawk, )
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER Discharging 594 Order to Show Cause, Staying Case, and Closing Case Administratively. On or after May 1, 2014, but before May 15, 2014, the plaintiff, Dean Carbajal, MAY SEEK TO REOPEN this case by complying with the requirements stated in this Order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/27/2014. (klyon, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections and Denying Motion to Reconsider. The objections stated in Plaintiff's Notice To the Court of the Clerk's Refusal To Mail Court Orders To the Plaintiff and Contemporaneous Objection To the Denia l of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Schedule Conference, Reset Timelines, Disclosures and Set Trial [# 431 ] filed January 29, 2013, are OVERRULED. Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a), the objections stated in Plaintiff Dean Ca rbajal's Contemporaneous Objection To Magistrate JudgeKristen Mix's Order [January 14, 2014] That Will Improperly Compel the Dismissal of an indigent Plaintiff's Case Due To Mr. Carbajal's Poverty and Inability To Pay Sanctions [# 591 ] filed February 3, 2014, are OVERRULED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/13/2014.(klyon, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 584 VACATED - ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion [#502] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. ORDERED that Defendants Watts and Gruninger shall file affidavits attesting to their reasonable expenses, including attorneys fees, on or befor e February 6, 2014. ORDERED that, if Plaintiff contests the amount of expenses sought by Defendants, he shall file a response to the affidavits on or before February 27, 2014. No reply will be permitted by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/15/14.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 1/21/2014 to vacate pursuant to Minute Order dated 1/21/2014 (klyon, ).
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider 562 is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendants Motions for Fees and Costs [558, 575, 576, 577] are GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall make the payments due to Defendants, as listed above, on or before March 14, 2014. ORDERED that all discovery in this matter shall remain STAYED until further order of the Court by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/14/14.(jjhsl, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the discovery Motions [#498, #500, #504, #505, #510, #521] are DENIED without prejudice, based on the stay of discovery entered in this matter on October 11, 2013. See Order [#553]. When and if the stay of discovery is re moved, pending discovery motions may be timely refiled, if necessary, within thirty (30) days of the issuance of the order lifting the stay. ORDERED that the deadline Motions [#548, #550, #566] are GRANTED in part. The pending discovery and dispositive motions deadlines are VACATED. ORDERED that the fees Motions [#557, #564] are DENIED as moot based on the Court-ordered filing of amended Motions [#576, #577] by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/09/14.(jjhsl, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MINUTE ORDER: The initial Motion for Fees and Costs [# 555 ] is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend [#570] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file responses to Defendants' Motions/Affidavits [# 557 , # 558 , # 560 , # 564 ] onor before 12/6/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/18/2013.(klyon, )
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 526 Joint Motion for Dismissal as Sanction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 37. Defendants shall file affidavits attesting to their reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, on or before 10/28/2013. If P laintiff contests the amount of expenses soughtby Defendants, he shall file a response to the affidavits on or before 11/14/2013. All discovery in this matter is STAYED until further order of the Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/11/2013.(klyon, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER re: 502 MOTION for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With an Order From This Court filed by Ed (I) Gruninger, Jeffrey (I) Watts. On or before 8/23/2013, Plaintiff shall either: (a) provide Defendants with signed and notarize d copies of the releases ordered by the Court on 3/18/2013 [# 459 ], or (b) file a Surreply to the Motion [# 502 ] with a personaldeclaration signed under penalty of perjury pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1746 that outlines in detail Plaintiff's e fforts to obtain notarization of the releases, as delineated by the Court in (1)-(4) of the Order. Failure to follow this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including the possibility of the dismissal of Defendants Watts and Gruninger fr om this action.If Plaintiff provides Defendants Watts and Gruninger with releases as a result of this Order, Defendants Watts and Gruninger shall timely file a Status Report regarding the sufficiency of Plaintiff's releases. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/26/2013. (klyon, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting 495 Motion for Order Directing the US Marshals to Serve the Subpoena Duces Tecum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve the subpoenas filed as part of the Motion, along with a copy of this Order. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/13. (mjgsl, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER denying 482 Motion for an Order Directing the US Marshalls to Serve the Attach Subpoena Duces Tecum. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/15/2013.(klyon, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting 451 Motion for Protective Order. The Notices [#451-2] issued by Plaintiff on 1/31/2013 are invalidated. The discovery deadline is extended to 7/31/2013. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to 8/30/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/14/2013. (klyon, )
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 486 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/07/2013. (klmcd)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's Contemporaneous Objection To the Court's Order Adopting Recommendation of Magistrate Judge's Denial of Injunction [Doc. # 414 ] [# 463 ] read either as a motionunder FED. R. CIV. P. 60(b) or as a motion to reconsider, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/2/2013. (klyon, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MINUTE ORDER; 453 Motion to Compel is DENIED AS MOOT. 460 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is a GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/22/2013.(klmcd, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDERED that 428 Motion for a Protection Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and an Order Granting Mr. Carbajal Leave to Meet With His Investigator and Lead Assistant to Prepare Discovery and Conduct Depositions is DENIED in part, DENIED as moot i n part, DENIED without prejudice in part, and GRANTED in part. On or before 4/1/2013, Defendants shall file a proposed protective order that addresses the confidentiality of Plaintiff's medical records and tax return information. On or before 4/ 15/2013, Plaintiff may file objections to the proposed protective order. Plaintiff shall produce the ordered documents and/or execute the required releases for production of ordered documents within fourteen days of the Court issuing a protective ord er regarding confidentiality of Plaintiff's records. No extension of these deadlines shall be granted absent exceptional circumstances. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the following documents UNDER RESTRICTION at LEVEL 1:5 Docket Nos. 436-3, 436-4, 438-1. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER. Defendants Fred McKee's and Bill Railey's Request for Clarification of Order Concerning Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 396 is GRANTED; That my order 390 is CLARIFIED to include my analysis, as stated in this ord er, of the objection 379 of defendants Fred McKee and Bill Railey; That on the basis outlined above, the objections stated in Defendants Fred McKee's and Bill Railey's Objection To Magistrate Judge Mix's Order 379 , which actually is an objection to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 369 , are OVERRULED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/6/13. (kfinn, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 415 Motion to Compel a Schedule Conference, Reset Timeline, Compel Disclosures, and Set Trial is DENIED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/2012.(klmcd, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER denying with respect to Mr. Serra 266 Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 11. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/27/12.(kfinn, )
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER CONCERNING RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 369 filed 8/29/2012, respectfully is REJECTED to the extent the magistrate judge recommends that the plaintiffs Fourt eenth Amendment procedural due process claim be dismissed based on the conclusion that the allegations in the complaint indicate that the plaintiff had an adequate post-deprivation state remedy for the deprivation of liberty he alleges in his complai nt. On the issue described in paragraph one (1), above, the objections stated in the plaintiffs Contemporaneous Objection to the Magistrates Order and Recommendation 382 filed 9/17/2012 are SUSTAINED. Otherwise, the objections stated in the plain tiffs ContemporaneousObjection to the Magistrates Order and Recommendation 382 filed 9/17/2012 are OVERRULED. The Delta Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs ThirdAmended Complaint 271 filed 2/6/2012, is GRANTED in part and DENIED. The Delta Sheriff-Deputies Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 272 filed 2/6/2012, is DENIED. The Delta Prosecutors Motion To Dismiss Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended 273 filed 2/6/2012, is GRANTED. The Board of County Commissioners of Delta Countys Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 274 filed 2/6/2012, is GRANTED. The Delta Sheriff-Deputies Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 272 filed February 6, 2012, is DENIED as to the p laintiffs conspiracy claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The Delta Sheriff-Deputies Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 272 filed February 6, 2012, is DENIED as to the plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment substantive due process claim. The Delta Sheriff-Deputies Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 272 filed 2/6/62012, is DENIED as to the plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process claim. The Delta Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Am ended Complaint 271 filed 2/6/2012, is DENIED. The Delta Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 271 filed 2/6/2012, is GRANTED. Defendants Myrl Serra, Sherri Price, Unknown Representative (Patricia Kramer Estate), and Board of County Commissioners of Delta County, Colorado are DROPPED as defendants in this case, and the caption shall be AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/24/2012.(cmacd, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion To the Trial Court and Request for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/19/12.(mjgsl, )
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 357 Petition for Federal Injunction and denying as moot 359 Motion to Set Hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/12.(mjgsl, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 364 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Allow a Representative from the Plaintiffs Defense Team to Be Present with Myrl Serra and Gwen Serra for the Scheduled Sanctions Hearing or in [the] Alternative the Plaintiff Contemporaneously Objects to the Denial of Fairness and Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/30/2012.(ervsl, )
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 340 Defendant Serra's Motion to Quash Subpoena, and granting in part to the extent that the Court will consider Plaintiff's Response, and denying in part in all other respects 345 Plaintiff's Petition to Enforce Subpoena or in Alternative Modify and Response to Serra's Petition to Quash Subpoena. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/15/12.(mjgsl, )
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION AND DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER. The objections stated in the plaintiff's Contemporaneous Objection To the Court's Order (DOC # 323 ) and Motion for Reconsideration 334 filed May 11, 2012, read as an objection to the order 323 of the magistrate judge, are OVERRULED, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/14/12.(mjgsl, )
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MINUTE ORDER denying 331 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Replies(DOCs # 327 , 328 , 329 , & 330 ). The filing of "surreplies" to the pending Motions to Dismiss is not permitted. Any such "surreplies" shall be summarily stricken, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/11/2012.(wjcsl, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER the Habeas Petition 313 is DENIED. The Subpoena Petition 315 is GRANTED. The Motion 317 is GRANTED. The Evidentiary Hearing set for April 16, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and reset to June 26, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-204 befo re Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Plaintiff and Defendant Serra shall provide to each other and to the Court an updated list of exhibits each expects to submit and of witnesses each expects to call by filing such lists on the docket no later than June 19, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/12.(mjgsl, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER. The Motion for Sanctions 266 is DENIED with respect to all Defendants except for Defendant Serra. The Court defers adjudication of the merit of Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions against Defendant Serra until the Court holds an evidentiary he aring on this issue. The Motion to Set Hearing 265 , which requests a hearing to determine the amount of sanctions to be awarded pursuant to the Motion for Sanctions, is GRANTED in part. An Evidentiary Hearing is SET for 4/16/2012 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Plaintiff and Defendant Serra shall provide to each other and to the Court a list of exhibits each expects to submit and of witnesses each expects to call at the hearing no later than 4/9/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/7/2012.(sah, )
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTE ORDER. The Request for Clarification of Briefing Requirements for Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint 261 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/31/2012.(sah, )
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint 249 is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint on or before 2/6/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/2011.(sah, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER. The Motion 236 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and that the Third Amended Complaint 243 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff may make one final attempt to file anappropriate amended complaint, accompanied by a motion for leave to amend, no later than 1/21/2012. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2012 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and, if necessary, will be reset at a later date. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2011.(sah, )
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER. The plaintiffs Ex Parte Petition for Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 65 239 filed 11/18/2011, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/22/2011.(sah, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification and/or ContemporaneousObjection and Request for Leave To Appeal An Order Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P.Rule 54(b) 234 filed 11/1/2011, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/10/2011.(sah, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 198 filed 8/8/2011, is rejected respectfully to the extent the magistrate judge recommends that the plaintiffs claims against Myrl Serra and Sherri Price based on allegations that these d efendants intentionally destroyed exculpatory evidence in plaintiff Dean Carbajals criminal case be dismissed based on prosecutorial immunity. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 198 filed8/8/2011, is rejected respectfully to the extent the magistrate judge recommendsthat the plaintiffs claims against Carol Warner, Richard Mahar, David Romero, and Joseph Quintana based on allegations that these defendants intentionally prepared and submitted false affidavits in support of con tentions that Dean Carbajal had violated the terms of his parole and/or deferred judgment be dismissed based on quasi-judicial or qualified immunity. The Second Response To Second Amended Complaint and Motion for Relief From Suit 128 filed 4/13/201 1, which I read as a motion to dismiss, is GRANTED. All claims asserted against defendant Gregory Sullivan are DISMISSED with prejudice. tTe Defendants, Seventh Judicial District, Delta County Board of County Commissioners, Myrl Serra, Sherri Price , Patricia Kramer, Unknown Delta Sheriff, Bill Railey, Chris Weldon, Deputy Hatch, B. Wolfe, and Brian Shroeders, Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs [Second] Amended Complaint 135 filed 4/28/2011, is DENIED as to claims asserted by plaintiff Dean Carbaja l against defendants Myrl Serra and Sherri Price based on allegations that these defendants destroyed exculpatory evidence in a criminal prosecution against plaintiff Dean Carbajal. Otherwise, the Defendants, Seventh Judicial District, Delta County B oard of County Commissioners, Myrl Serra, Sherri Price, Patricia Kramer, Unknown Delta Sheriff, Bill Railey, Chris Weldon, Deputy Hatch, B. Wolfe, and Brian Shroeders, Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs [Second] Amended Complaint 135 filed 4/28/2011, is GRANTED. under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), all claims asserted by the plaintiffs against defendants Seventh Judicial District, Delta County Board of County Commissioners, Myrl Serra, Sherri Price, Patricia Kramer, Unknown Delta Sheriff, Bill Railey, Ch ris Weldon, Deputy Hatch, B. Wolfe, Brian Shroeder are DISMISSED with prejudice, except for the claims asserted by plaintiff Dean Carbajal against defendants Myrl Serra and Sherri Price based on allegations that these defendants destroyed exculpatory evidence in a criminal prosecution against Dean Carbajal. The State Defendants Motion To Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint 137 filed 4/29/2011, is DENIED to the extent plaintiff Dean Carbajal asserts claims against defendants Carol Warner, Davi d Romero, and Joseph Quintana based on allegations that these defendants, acting as probation officers, knowingly and intentionally prepared and submitted false affidavits in support of contentions that Dean Carbajal had violated the terms of his par ole and/or deferred judgment. Otherwise, the State Defendants Motion To Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint 137 filed 4/29/2011, is GRANTED. under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), all claims against defendants Steven Patrick, Charles Greenacre, Sandra Mi ller, James Schum, Jeff Herron, Mandy Allen, Carrol Warner, David Romero, Joe Quintana, and the Colorado Department of Corrections are DISMISSED with prejudice, except for the claims asserted by plaintiff Dean Carbajal against defendants Carol Warner , David Romero, and Joseph Quintana based on allegations that these defendants, acting as probation officers, knowingly and intentionally prepared and submitted false affidavits in support of contentions that Dean Carbajal had violated the terms of h is parole and/or deferred judgment. The claims against defendant Jeff Boyd Herron based on his alleged conduct when acting as a judicial officer are DISMISSED with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1). The claims against defendant Jeff Boyd Her ron based on his alleged conduct when acting as a defense attorney are DISMISSED with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss 141 is GRANTED on the terms stated in paragraphs fourteen (14) through twenty-on e (21),below. The plaintiffs complaint 119 is DISMISSED for failure to comply with the requirements of FED. R. CIV. P. 8. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the claims asserted by plaintiff Victoria Carbajal are DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), all claims asserted against individual defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), all claims asserted against defendants Don Wick, Arvada Chief of Police, and Denver Chie f of Police are DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the claims asserted against defendant government entities Seventh Judicial District, Delta County Board of County Commissioners, City of Denver, Colorado Department of Correcti ons, City of Westminster, and City of Arvada are DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), all claims against defendants Patrick Meester, A.J. DeAndrea, and Jourdan Lopez-Basgall are DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12 (b)(6), plaintiff Dean Carbajals state law claim for fraud asserted against all defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), all claims based on alleged conduct that occurred before 11/23/2009, excluding any claim directly related to the improper extension or revocation of plaintiff Dean Carbajals deferred judgment, are DISMISSED with prejudice because all such claims are time barred. The Defendants Joint Motion To Dismiss 141 is DENIED without prejudice to the ext ent the defendants argue for the dismissal of other claims for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted and based on theassertion of qualified immunity. The Motion by Defendants Laurie Freund, James Dixon, Adam Barrett, Sgt. Speerman, Joel Smith, Abbegayle Dorn, Jesse Rembert, Michael ONeill, Brian ONeill and Unknown Denver Police Officers One Through Four To Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. Rule 12(b)(5) 142 is DENIED without prejudice. The foll owing parties are DROPPED from this action: a) plaintiff Victoria Carbajal, b) Seventh Judicial District, c) Delta County Board of County Commissioners, d) Jeff Boyd Herron, e) J. Steven Patrick, f) Charles R. Greenacre, g) Sandra K. Miller, h) James W. Schum, i) Mandy Allen, j) Patricia Kramer; k) Unknown Delta Sheriff, l) Cityof Denver, m) Denver Chief of Police, n) Colorado Department of Corrections, o) City of Westminster, p) City of Arvada, q) Don Wick, r) Patrick Meester, s) A.J. DeAndrea, t) Jourdan Lopez-Basgall; and u) Gregory Sullivan. The Supplemental Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 202 filed August 9, 2011, which clarifies the recommendation of the magistrate judge concerning the dismissal with prejudice of c laims against the Denver Chief of Police, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The Supplemental Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 207 filed 8/19/2011, which clarifies the recommendation of the magistrate judge concerning the dismissal with preju dice of claims against the City of Arvada, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. Defendants Request for Clarification, or Alternatively, Objection to Courts 8/8/2011 Report and Recommendation 209 filed 8/22/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/2011.(sah2, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant City of Westminsters Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference 225 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference currently set for10/20/2011 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. The Scheduling Conference will be reset, if necessary, after final resolution of the Motions to Dismiss [Docket Nos. 128, 135, 137, 141 & 142]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/5/2011.(sah2, )
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER. The Petition 220 , the Request 221 , and the Motion 222 are STRICKEN. Pursuant to my Order dated 6/23/2011, neither Plaintiff shall file anymotions until a written order has been issued on the pending Motions to Dismiss. Order 181 at 3. No order has yet been issued. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/27/2011.(sah, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions 214 is STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/25/2011.(sah, )
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 195 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Rule 12 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' 197 proposed Surreply is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/8/11.(mnfsl, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/23/2011, denying without prejudice 140 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay, setting a Scheduling Conference for 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2011. (FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom C-204) (mehcd)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. Plaintiffs Combined Motion for Leave to Substitute Service Pursuant to Colo. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(f), Substitution of Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 25, and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Rule 12 Motions 144 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/16/2011.(sah, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part 124 Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify and Joinder [sic] Necessary. "Eddie Gruninger, Detective Investigator for the Second Judicial District" is added as a Defendant. The Court's prior 118 order striking all egations against Defendant Gruninger from the 119 Second Amended Complaint is vacated. Defendant Gruninger shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' 119 Second Amended Complaint on or before 4/29/2011. The case caption is amended to r eflect the addition of Defendant Gruninger and the removal of "Unknown Denver Police Officers 1-4." The 124 Motion is denied without prejudice to the extent that it requests the addition of defendants. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/14/11.(mnf, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 107 is GRANTED in part, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice with respect to Plaintiffs request to add the following entities and individuals named in the Second Amended Complaint as defendant s ( See Order for details). Plaintiffs may not file any motion to amend their Second Amended Complaint until after case management deadlines have been set at the Scheduling Conference on 6/23/2011. all Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond t o Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [107-1, 107-2, 108, 108-1 & 108-2] on or before 4/29/2011. The following Motions to Dismiss are DENIED without prejudice 31 ; 34 ; 38 ; 39 ; 40 ; 41 ; 49 ; 50 ; 51 ; 52 ; 74 ; 76 ; 99 ; 100 ; 102 ; 110 ;[11 2]; 113 ; 114 and 116 . Denver Defendants Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) 47 is DENIED without prejudice because it also relates to the Amended Complaint [#33], a non-operative pleading. Defendant Adams County Board of County Commissioners Motion to Dismiss 45 is DENIED as moot. This Defendant has been dismissed from this case. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/4/2011.(sah, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Plaintiffs motion to dismiss parties, actually entitled Plaintiffs (sic) Voluntary Dismissal of Suit Against Adams County BOCC, Adams County Probation, Montrose County BBOC, Gunnison County BOCC, City of Delta,Unknown Arvada Police Officer 1, Unknown Arvada Police Officer 2, ArvadaPolice Dept., Westminster Police Dept., Denver Police Dept. And Delta Sheriffs Dept., and Claim 16-18 U.S.C. 242 88 filed 3/23/2011, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/2011.(sah, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2011 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and RESET to 6/23/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/21/2011. (sah, ) Modified on 3/23/2011 to indicate that the Order is a Minute Order(sah2, ).
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service 43 is GRANTED.Plaintiffs must complete service of all Defendants named in the original Complaint 1 on or before 6/21/2011. The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants [si c] Motions to Dismiss and Stay of Proceedings 56 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs request for leave to amend theirAmended Complaint 27 is DENIED without prejudice. Any motion to amend and accompanying proposed Second Amended Complaint must be filed on or before 4/1/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/14/2011.(sah, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 24 is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/10/2011. Those Defendants who have already been served and entered their appearances in this case shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint [24-1] on or before 3/7/2011.Defendants Motions to Dismiss 6 , 11 & 18 are DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/10/2011(sah, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Leave to Amend Complaint 15 is GRANTED IN PART. On or before 2/7/2011 Plaintiffs shall either (1) file a response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss 6 and 11 , or(2) file a motion to amend their Complaint 1 that includes a proposed amended complaint as an attachment. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/7/2011.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal v. Warner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventh Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montrose County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunnison County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Greenacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrl Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Delta, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montrose Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrol Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Railey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Shroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Westminster, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arvada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvada Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvada Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Meester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. DeAndrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jourdan Lopez-Basgall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy (I) Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven (I) Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Schum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles (I) Greenacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra (I) Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff (I) Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrl (I) Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri (I) Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrol (I) Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe (I) Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth (I) Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill (I) Railey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris (I) Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. (I) Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. (I) Shroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto (I) Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick (I) Meester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) J. DeAndrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jourdan (I) Lopez-Basgall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?