Ressler et al v. Boeing Company, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Regina Ressler and Randy Ressler
Defendant: Boeing Company, Inc., The, BE Aerospace, Inc. and Burns Aerospace Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv03050
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER of Dismissal. (This Order Relates to Civil Action No. 10-cv-03050-REB-BNB). The Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice [# 280 ] is APPROVED. 10-cv-03050-REB-BNB is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2013. (klyon, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER of DISMISSAL (This Order Relates to Civil Action No. 11-cv-03070-REB-BNB). The Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice [# 277 ] is APPROVED. 11-cv-03070-REB-BNB is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. Any pending motion filed in Civil Action 11-cv-03070-REB-BNB, is DENIED as moot. 11-cv-03070-REB-BNB SHALL NOT APPEAR in the caption of this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/25/2013. (klyon, )
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER of Dismissal (This Order Relates to Civil Action No. 11-cv-02894-REB-BNB). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/22/2013. (klyon, ) Modified on 4/22/2013 to correct typing error (klyon, ).
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER approving 252 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. 11-cv-1874-REB-BNB is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/10/13. (kfinn, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER approving 250 Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice. 11-cv-02253-REB-BNB is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/13. (kfinn, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER denying as moot 190 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 191 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 229 Motion to Exclude; denying as moot 230 Motion to Exclude; denying as moot 231 Motion to Exclude; denying as moot 232 Motion to Exclude; denying as moot 233 Motion to Exclude. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/6/13. (kfinn, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/22/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Ten (10) day Bench Trial set for 4/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/25/12. (rebsec, )
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 93 Defendant United States of America's Motion to Dismiss Claims of McLean Plaintiffs. The claims of plaintiffs James McLean, Theresa McLean, Jaclyn McLean, and Josef McLean, brought under the Federal Tort Claims Act, are DIS MISSED with prejudice. plaintiffs James McLean, Theresa McLean, Jaclyn McLean, and Josef McLean, are DROPPED as plaintiffs in Civil Action No. 11-cv-02253, which is consolidated with Civil Action No. 10-cv-03050, and the caption in Civil Action No. 11- cv-02253 shall be AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/20/12.(mjgsl, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE. The Defendant United States' Motion to Strike Exhibit B (Document 114-2), National Transportation Safety Board Accident Report and All References Thereto in Mclean Plaintiffs Response to the United States of Americas Motion to Dismiss 115 , is GRANTED. Exhibit B [114-2] to the McLean plaintiffs' response 114 to the defendant's motion to dismiss 93 , and all references thereto in the response 114 , are STRICKEN. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/19/12.(mjgsl, )
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Bifurcate Trial. Counsel are instructed to contact the court's administrative assistant, Susan Schmitz, at (303) 335-2350 on Tuesday, September 25, 2012, at 10:30 a.m., to schedule a trial preparation conference and trial to the court on the issues of liability only. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/17/12.(mjgsl, )
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE ORDER granting 204 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Allow Supplemental Expert Depositions on October 2 and 3, 2012. Scheduling Order is amended to allow the depositions of Drs. Steven Morris and Kenneth Orloff on October 2 and 3, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/14/2012.(klyon, )
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: 168 Plaintiff Global Aerospace, Inc.'s Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/6/12.(bnbcd, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER and Protective Order: 171 United States' Motion for Release of Cockpit Voice Recorder is GRANTED, protective order incorporated. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/3/12.(bnbcd, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER: Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Henry B. Goddard 183 is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/19/12.(bnbcd, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER 175 Plaintiff Global Aerospace, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/11/12.(bnbcd, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. The Unopposed Motion To Consolidate byDefendant United States of America 125 is GRANTED. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Fields v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-03069-REB-KMT, a nd Vaziri v. United Sates, Civil Action No. 11-cv-03070-PAB-KMT are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No.10- cv-03050-REB-BNB for all purposes. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 11-cv-03069-REB-KMT and Civil Action No. 11-cv-03070-PAB-KMT are REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/21/2012.(sah, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: granting 146 Plaintiff Mary Beth Finnegans Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; granting 147 Plaintiffs Joe & Arleyne Glassers Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/30/12.(bnbcd, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER : granting 139 the Plaintiff Global Aerospace, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to file Revised First Amended Complaint Consistent With the Courts Order Regarding Case Caption. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Global Aerospace, Inc.s Revised First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/12.(bnbcd, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: re: 137 Amended Complaint filed by Mary Beth Finnegan is STRICKEN, 138 Amended Complaint filed by Joe M. Glasser is STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/12. (bnbcd, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER. Plaintiff Global Aerospace, Inc.s Motion to Amend Complaint 121 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/10/2012.(sah, )
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER. McLean Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Re-File Their Response To Defendants Motion To Strike Exhibit B and All References Thereto in Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion To Dismiss 132 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/2012.(sah, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER. The Contag Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and to Add Additional Plaintiff 117 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/2011.(sah, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/14/11. (bnbcd, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Roger D. Drake 102 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/9/2011.(sah2, )
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. The Stipulation of Dismissal of The Boeing Company, BEAerospace, Inc., and Burns Aerospace Corp. With Prejudice 96 filed 11/7/2011, is APPROVED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/7/2011. (sah, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 11/30/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/2011. (sah, )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. The Defendant United States of Americas Motion To Consolidate and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1 67 filed 9/8/2011, is GRANTED. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Conta g v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01832-MSK-MJW, Global Aerospace, Inc. v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01874-WYD-KMT, and Craft, et al. v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-02253-REB-MJW, are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No.1 0-cv-03050-REB-BNB for all purposes. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01832-MSK-MJW and Civil Action No. 11-cv-01874-WYD-KMT, both are REASSIGNED to United States District Judge Robert E. Blackburn and United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No.11-cv-02253-REB-MJW is REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/24/2011.(sah, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/25/2011. ORDERED: Unopposed Motion to Modify Expert Designation Dates and Request for Further Status Conference [Docket No. 55] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Counsel are ordered to confer and develop what they believe to be an appropriate schedule given the current posture of the case. Counsel shall submit either an unopposed motion or competing motions to revise the schedule by September 9, 2011. (FTR: Laura Galera) (lag)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER granting: 49 Motion to Amend Consolidated Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/11.(bnbcd, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: denying without prejudice 43 Motion to Amend complaint; granting 46 Motion for extension. Expert Disclosures: (a) The plaintiffs shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26( a)(2) on or before August 15, 2011 (b) The defendants shall designate all experts and rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before September 15, 2011 (c) The plaintiffs shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before October 15, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/11.(bnbcd, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. The parties Unopposed Motion To Consolidate 15 filed 1/31/2011, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No.10-cv-03051-CMA-BNB is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No.10-cv-03050-REB-BNB for all purposes. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/2/2011.(sah, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 5/7/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/11. (rebsec, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER. Unopposed Motion to Vacate Minute Order Setting rule 16(b)) Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines (Dkt. #18] and to Reset Deadlines pending Ruling on Motion to Consolidate 27 , is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/28/2011.(sah, )
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part 16 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Order Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 16(f) Planning Meeting. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/22/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/2/11.(bnbcd, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/4/11. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ressler et al v. Boeing Company, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Ressler
Represented By: Patricia M. Jarzobski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Ressler
Represented By: Patricia M. Jarzobski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BE Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns Aerospace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?