Zimmer Spine, Inc. v. EBI, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zimmer Spine, Inc.
Defendant: EBI, LLC and Adam Veri
Case Number: 1:2010cv03112
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 35 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/22/2012. (eseam)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE PROTECTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/19/11. (cbssec)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 11/16/2011 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/17/11. (cbssec)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants, EBI, LLC (Biomet) and Adam Veri (Veri), seeking dismissal of four of the claims for relief asserted against them by Plaintiff, Zimmer Spine Inc. (Zimmer Spine) in its amended complaint 13 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants Motion to Dismiss, filed on 2/14/2011, seeking dismissal of Plaintiffs previously-filed Complaint 7 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/14/2011.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmer Spine, Inc. v. EBI, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zimmer Spine, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Featherstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBI, LLC
Represented By: David H. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Veri
Represented By: David H. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?