Galyas v. Lockheed Martin Corp.
Plaintiff: Felicia Galyas
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Case Number: 1:2010cv03122
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. Seven-day Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/4/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/21/12. (mnfsl, )
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Amended Response to Motion for Leave to Extend time and Permit Plaintiff to Supplement Responses to Lockheed Martin's First Request for Admission Nos. 2, 6, 7, 9, 10 & 11. The attached Amended Response will be used as the response to the plaintiff's motion. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/6/12.(mnfsl, )
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: denying as withdrawn 39 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing set for November 18, 2011, is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/15/11.(bnbcd, )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER accepting 21 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge to the extent it recommends that the motion to intervene be denied. The 11 Motion to Intervene is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/11.(mnf, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/11. (bnbcd, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/7/11. (ebs, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/27/2010. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galyas v. Lockheed Martin Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Galyas
Represented By: Carl Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?