December 14, 2012 |
Filing
80
JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of John S. Hollingshead against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Stanley Works Long Term Disability Plan, The re: 79 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees and costs, Plaintiff is awarded a total of $28,976.44 in attor neys fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall pay the sum awarded to Plaintiff on or before January 11, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Prejudgment Interest is DENIED, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 12/14/2012. (ervsl, )
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Prejudgment Interest. Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys fees and costs is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is awarded a total of $28,976.44 in attorneys fees and costs; Defendants shall pay the sum awarded to Plaintiff on or before January 11, 2013; and Plaintiffs Motion for Prejudgment Interest is DENIED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2012.(ervsl, )
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER that the Courts Order to Show Cause ECF No. 69 , is MADE ABSOLUTE, and Plaintiffs state law civil theft claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court notes that the parties are scheduled for a Status Conference before U.S. Magistrate Judg e Craig B. Shaffer on April 24, 2012. Among other things, the parties shall be prepared to discuss with Judge Shaffer at this Status Conference a proposed schedule for the prompt resolution of any remaining matters at issue in this action attendant to Plaintiffs federal ERISA claim, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/13/2012. (ervsl, )
|
March 21, 2012 |
Filing
68
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 15 Defendant Aetnas Partial Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part and Denying part 17 Defendant Stanleys Partial Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/21/2012.(ervsl, )
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
67
ORDER granting 63 Defendants Motion for Limited Stay and all proceedings in this case are stayed until October 22, 2011. The stay will end on October 22, 2011, at which time the District Judge may rule on the pending Partial Motion to Dismiss 15 , Defendants... the Stanley Works Long Term Disability Plans Rule 12(b)(6) Partial Motion to Dismiss 17 , and Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Judge Shaffers Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery 48 , and conduct any other proceedings as he deems appropriate. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/20/2011.(erv, )
|
August 31, 2011 |
Filing
59
ORDER re: 56 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Stanley Works, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/31/2011. (erv, )
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER re: 41 Stipulation, filed by Stanley Works, The, Stanley Works Long Term Disability Plan, The; The Plaintiffs Third Claim for Relief (Refusal to Supply Requested Plan Documents under 29 U.S.C. 1132(c)) is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall pay his or its own fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/29/2011. (erv, )
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2011. (erv, )
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
4
ORDERREGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/4/11. (mskcd)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/8/2011 at 10:00 a.m. A Proposed Scheduling Order, as well as Confidential Settlement Statements, are due no later than 5:00 p.m. on 3/1/11, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/29/10. (cbssec)
|