Bleck v. City of Alamosa, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Steve W. Bleck
Defendant: City of Alamosa, Colorado, John (I) Jackson, John Jackson, Jeff (I) Martinez, Jeff Martinez, B. (I) Cooper and B. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2010cv03177
Filed: December 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 JUDGMENT by Clerk: That judgment IS ENTERED on behalf of defendant, The City of Alamosa, Colorado, and against plaintiff, The Estate of Steven Wayne Bleck, by Joanna Churchill, Personal Representative for Steven Wayne Bleck, deceased, on plaintiff� 39;s sole remaining cause of action against the City for failure to train; That the City is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the clerk of the court in the time and manner prescribed in Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1; and That this case is closed. Re: 233 Order.By Clerk on 5/13/15. (kfinn)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: re: 130 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment 38 and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. That judgment shall enter on behalf of defendant, The City of Alamosa, Colorado, and against plaintiff, The Estate of Steven Wayne Bleck, by Joanna Churchill, Personal Representative for Steven Wayne Bleck, deceased, on plaintiff's sole remaining cause of action against the City for failure to train; That the City is awarded its costs, to be taxed by the clerk of the court in the time and manner prescribed in Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/12/15. (kfinn)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment 38 filed 8/15/2011, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 130 filed 1 /20/2012, is DENIED. Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Retained Expert Witnesses 122 , filed January 5, 2012; (b) Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Defendants Expert Major Ijames and Request for Sanctions for Failure To Produce Records Pursuant to S ubpoena Duces Tecum 123 filed January 5, 2012; and (c) Plaintiffs Motion To Strike Defendants Retained Expert Witness Donna Heltzell, R.N. 151 , filed 2/9/2012, are DENIED AS MOOT. The telephonic setting conference currently scheduled for 4/10/2012 at 10:00 a.m. (MDT), is VACATED. On all claims dismissed with prejudice, defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/2012.(sahsl, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. The Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 188 filed 3/5/2012, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The trial, currently scheduled to commence on 4/2/2012, at 8:30 a.m., is VACATED and CONTINUED pending further order of the court. The Trial Preparation Conference and trial SHALL BE RESET during a telephonic setting conference on 4/10/2012, at 10:00 a.m. (MDT). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/2012. (sah, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the District Court VACATE the trial set in this matter for April 2, 2012 and the Trial Preparation Conference set for March 16, 2012 and re-set the trial for a date convenient to the court's calendar, but not earlier than July 16, 2012. Any objections to the Recommendation shall be filed on or before March 9, 2012 or deemed waived. ORDER denying 155 Motion to Strike and denying 166 Motion to Strike. For further information, please see Order and Recommendation. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/2012.(kmtcd)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion To File Supplemental Argument For SummaryJudgment 126 filed 1/10/2012, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File a Supplement To Plaintiffs Response (Doc. No 47) To 8/15/2011 Defendants Motion For Judgment on The Pleadings and For Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 38) 129 filed 1/20/2012, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/31/2012.(sah, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. The Stipulated Motion For Partial Dismissal 108 filed 12/13/2011, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants, John Jackson and B. Cooper, are DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/2011.(sah, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2011, granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Compel. For further information regarding deadlines, please see minutes. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2011; Granting in Part 70 Motion for Discovery, as specified. Reasonable travel costs for the Plaintiff to appear in Lakewood and in Colorado Spri ngs to attend the medical examinations will be borne equally by Plaintiff and Defendants. Withdrawing 87 Motion to Strike; ORDERED: Defendants Oral Motion To Withdraw Doc. No. 87 is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, to be reconsidered if a similar motion is filed at a later date. Discovery due by 1/20/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (FTR: B. Abiakam)(babia)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/3/2011. (kmtcd)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Courts 9/8/2011 Minute Order 52 , and in the Alternative Motion for Extension of Time for Disclosure of Experts, and Request for Status Conference 57 is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Report 56 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/27/2011.(sah, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER. The Joint Motion to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Court Ruling on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery" 44 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Expert Witness Disclosures 10/21/2011; Rebu ttal Expert Witness Disclosures 11/21/2011; Discovery due by 12/21/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2012; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/28/2011.(sah, )
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery 39 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Discovery related to Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Martinez is STAYED pending ruling on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment. Fu ll discovery against Defendant City of Alamosa shall proceed. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of ruling on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment to advise whether a scheduling conference should be set as to Defendant Martinez. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/27/2011.(sah, )
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 8/4/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/21/11. (lsw, )
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 4/21/2011 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/27/2011. (sah, ) Modified on 1/27/2011 to correct the month of the Scheduling Conference (sah, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleck v. City of Alamosa, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve W. Bleck
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: Maaren Linnea Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alamosa, Colorado
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff (I) Martinez
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Martinez
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. (I) Cooper
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cooper
Represented By: Jessica Kyle Muzzio
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?