Escobar v. Huertas et al
Plaintiff: Jose Medina Escobar
Defendant: H. Huertas, Titeman, Fretwell, West, P. Archuleta, Suter, J Englehart and D. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2011cv00169
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/6/2012. (jjpsl, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying 59 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/3/2012.(jjpsl, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 11/4/2011 RECOMMENDATION 41 OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; denying 37 Motion for a Prohibitory Injunction.By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/28/2011.(jjpsl, )
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying 54 Motion for Protection from Hostile Defendants, Right to Life. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/27/2011.(jjpsl, )
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay All Proceeding. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/5/11.(mnfsl, )
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/15/2011. (sah, )
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/14/11. (lyg, )
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/31/11. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Huertas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Medina Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Huertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fretwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Englehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?