Righthaven LLC v. OSM Media, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: OSM Media, LLC, Nina Yablock, Bryan Preston and Pajamas Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00240
Filed: January 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2012 Filing 37 REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (lygsl, )
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER. The stay in this case is lifted and Righthavens complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John L. Kane on 03/20/12. (jjhsl, )
October 25, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE by Defendant OSM Media, LLC (Flink, Marc)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER re: #33 Response to Order to Show Cause. In light of Righthaven's representation that it intends to appeal the decision underlying the Order to Show Cause entered in this case, this case shall be stayed until 10/27/2011. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/11/11. (mnfsl, )
October 8, 2011 Filing 33 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #32 by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC why Summary Judgment should not enter against it in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f)(3). Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2011. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/27/11. (mnfsl, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven George Ganim (Ganim, Steven)
June 28, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven George Ganim (Ganim, Steven)
June 23, 2011 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended #20 by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 6/24/2011 to delete duplicate text and create linkage (wjc, ).
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. This case is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss in Civil Case Number 1:11-cv-00830, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/19/2011. (wjc, )
May 12, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rajkumar Chohan on behalf of OSM Media, LLC, Nina Yablock (Chohan, Rajkumar)
May 12, 2011 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant OSM Media, LLC.. (Flink, Marc)
May 12, 2011 Filing 25 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Nina Yablock.(Flink, Marc)
May 12, 2011 Filing 24 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by OSM Media, LLC.(Flink, Marc)
May 12, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc David Flink on behalf of OSM Media, LLC, Nina Yablock (Flink, Marc)
April 22, 2011 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. OSM Media, LLC served on 4/21/2011, answer due 5/12/2011. (Ganim, Steven)
April 13, 2011 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against OSM Media, LLC, Bryan Preston, Nina Yablock, filed by Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ganim, Steven)
April 5, 2011 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC.. (Ganim, Steven)
March 23, 2011 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pajamas Media, Inc..(Flink, Marc)
March 1, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rajkumar Chohan on behalf of Pajamas Media, Inc. (Chohan, Rajkumar)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Twenty-One Day Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint. Pajamas Media, Inc. answer due 3/23/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/01/2011.(wjc, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Proposed Plan by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Ganim, Steven)
February 28, 2011 Filing 15 Docket Annotation re: #10 Summons Returned Executed. Modified on 2/28/2011 to add text for party served, served date and answer due date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 14 Docket Annotation re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Docket entry #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance was modified on 2/28/2011 to edit text to clarify title of document. Counsel informs Court document #12 Motion for Extension of Time is a duplicate filing of #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel refiled document #12 Motion for Extension of Time at document #13 Motion for Extension of Time using correct event. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Re: #1 Complaint by Defendant Pajamas Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Pajamas Media, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time To Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint)(Flink, Marc) Modified on 2/28/2011 to add linkage (wjc, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 12 Motion for Twenty-One Day Extension of Time to Answer Plead or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint by Defendant Pajamas Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Pajamas Media, Inc.'s Motion for Extension Of Time To Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint)(Flink, Marc) Modified on 2/28/2011 to edit text to clarify title of document (wjc, ). Modified on 3/1/2011 to create linkage (wjc, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc David Flink on behalf of Pajamas Media, Inc. (Flink, Marc)
February 28, 2011 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Pajamas Media, Inc. served on 2/9/2011, answer due 03/02/2011. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 2/28/2011 to add text for party served, served date and answer due date (wjc, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 9 Docket Annotation re: #7 Summons Returned Executed. Modified on 2/28/2011 to correct text served and answer due dates. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wjc, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 8 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Pajamas Media, Inc. answer due 3/2/2011 pursuant to #7 Summons Returned Executed filed 02/25/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Pajamas Media, Inc. served on 2/9/2011, answer due 03/02/2011. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 2/28/2011 to correct text served and answer due dates (wjc, ).
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. The 3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge is VACATED as are any previously scheduled court dates and hearings. Status Report due by 2/28/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/14/2011. (wjc, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 5 REASSIGNING JUDGE. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR40.1A., this case is reassigned to Judge John L. Kane. All future pleadings should reference Judge Kane's initials at the end of the case number (such as 11-cv-00001-JLK). TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wjc, )
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/3/2011. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(erv, )
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 03/02/2011 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 60 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/02/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cmasec)
January 28, 2011 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (lyg, )
January 28, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Pajamas Media, Inc. and Bryan Preston (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 34826) Summons Issued, filed by Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. OSM Media, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSM Media, LLC
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Rajkumar Chohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Yablock
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Rajkumar Chohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pajamas Media, Inc.
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Rajkumar Chohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Steven George Ganim
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?