Yampa Valley Electric Association, Inc. v. Three Forks Ranch Corp.
Plaintiff: |
Yampa Valley Electric Association, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Three Forks Ranch Corp. |
Counter_claimant: |
Three Forks Ranch Corp. |
Counter_defendant: |
Yampa Valley Electric Association, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00289 |
Filed: |
February 3, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Routt |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 2, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Five-day Jury Trial to commence on 9/17/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/24/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Fourteen days before t he trial preparation conference, counsel and any pro se party shall submit proposed jury instructions and verdict forms. Seven days before the trial preparation conference, the parties shall file via CM/ECF (1) their proposed voir dire questions; (2) their witness lists; and (3) their exhibit list. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/2/12. (jjpsl, )
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
50
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/16/2011; The parties request to reset th Final Pretrial Conference is GRANTED. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2012 at 9:15 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 2/1/2012 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2012. DENIED AS MOOT 28 Motion to Strike. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
31
MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/12/2011. Denying as Moot 16 Motion to Strike; Denying as Moot 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 10/30/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2011. The Settlement Conference set September 27, 2011 is VACATED. Parties shall submit Updated Confidential Settlement Statements on or before October 21, 2011. (FTR: Laura Galera) (lag) (lag, )
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/22/2011 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/10/11. (cbssec)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?