Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Heckel et al
Plaintiff: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Defendant: Larry Heckel, Heckel Construction, LLC and Harvest Gold Village Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00340
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/11/2011. (ervsl, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. A Motion Hearing was held on 3/30/2011. ORDERED: Harvest Gold Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Joinder in Heckel Defendants Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, doc # 19 , is DENIED. Answer due on or before APRIL 8, 2011. Heckel Defendants Motion to Stay Action, doc # 8 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Scheduling Conference currently set for April 25, 2011 at 9:15 a.m. is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2011 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/24/11. (mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Heckel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Adam Stevens
Represented By: John W. Grund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Heckel
Represented By: Eric Edward Torgersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heckel Construction, LLC
Represented By: Eric Edward Torgersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest Gold Village Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Michael Nelson
Represented By: Landon Lamont Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?