Gannett v. Poudre School District R-1 et al
Plaintiff: Sue Gannett
Defendant: Poudre School District R-1, Hayden Camp and Chuck DeWayne
Case Number: 1:2011cv00363
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/30/2013. (rpmcd )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/16/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Trial Preparation Conference for 8/23/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/4/2013. (rpmcd)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/4/2013 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order original only delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 3/28/2013, lead counsel present in person, and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 42 Order : the third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims for relief are dismissed, and Hayden Camp and Chuck DeWayne are dismissed as defendants in this civil action. The District's motion for summary judgment is denied as to the first and second claims for relief, by Clerk on 11/28/2012. (rpmcd)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER PERMITTING CORRECTED RESPONSE AND EXTENDING DEADLINES re 33 : plaintiff's corrected response 34 filed contemporaneously is accepted and defendants' reply due date is extended one day, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/5/2012.(rpmcd)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion. Discovery due by 4/16/2012, as to depositions only; discovery responses shall be submitted by March 5, 2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2012, 17 Motion terminated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/29/2012.(rpmcd)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 19 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/21/2012. (rpmcd)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/1/2011 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 25, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/21/2011. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannett v. Poudre School District R-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Gannett
Represented By: Cathy L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre School District R-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayden Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck DeWayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?