Martinez v. Adams County School District 14 et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Martinez
Defendant: Hollene Davis, Adams County School District 14, Lynn Heintzman, Phil Bedford and Sue Chandler
Case Number: 1:2011cv00372
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 107 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The jury trial scheduled for 1/7/2013 at 8:00 a.m. isvacated. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/2/13.(mnfsl, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. Defendants' 100 Motion to Strike the 96 Notice of Settlement is granted. Plaintiff's 96 Motion to Vacate Further Proceedings is denied. All deadlines, including those for filing plaintiff's proposed voir dire questions and witness and exhibit lists, are still in effect. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/12.(mnfsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/21/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer.By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/3/12. (pabcd)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2012. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 10/12/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The five (5 ) day Jury Trial is set to began on 10/29/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The defendants 76 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) is WITHDRAWN with out prejudice. The parties shall submit a new proposed Final Pretrial Order by May 9,2012 which shall include a brief statement as to what each witness plans to say. Parties are to contact Judge Brimmer's chambers to request new trial dates. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2012. Court DENIES 37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/20/11. (cbssec)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/2/11. (mnf, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference is granted. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/23/2011 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/1/11.(mnf, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/18/11. (mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Adams County School District 14 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollene Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County School District 14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Heintzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bedford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Martinez
Represented By: Cathy L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?