Harvey v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Harvey
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00467
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. ORDERED that this matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant John Wallace, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/11/12. (lygsl, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re: 91 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. ORDERED that this matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co., each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/31/12.(lygsl, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Common Law Bad Faith Claims With Prejudice. Plaintiff's common law bad faith claims against Defendant State Farm are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/10/2012. (eseam)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER; 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Confidentiality/Protective Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2012.(klmcd, )
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONFIDENTIALITY/PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/2012. (klmcd, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Confidentiality/Protective Order against Defendant, John C. Wallace 46 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/2012.(sah, )
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 39 is GRANTED. Affirmative expert disclosures 3/26/2012. Rebuttal expert disclosures 4/26/2012. Discovery deadline 6/4/2012. Dispositive motion deadline 7/5/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/3/2011.(sah2, )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONFIDENTIALITY/PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/29/2011. (klmcd )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend His Complaint (Unopposed) 26 os 6/3/2011 is GRANTED. The tendered Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/6/2011.(sah, )
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File its Designation of Non-Parties at Fault, signed by El Paso County District Court Judge Thomas K. Kane on 2/4/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Harvey
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig William Cain
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?