Hollander v. Zito et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Hollander
Defendant: Maximus Holdings, Gladius Investment Corp., Michael Beiter, Dan Volker, Steve Costa and Anthony J. Zito
Case Number: 1:2011cv00499
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Delta
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Margaret Hollander against Anthony J. Zito, Michael Beiter, Steve Costa re: 65 Order, by Clerk on 7/31/2013. (klyon, )
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2013. 47 Motion for Default Judgment is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, written recommendation to issue. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS: (1) Defendant Anthony Zit's Motions to Dismiss ( 11 & 16 ) are DENIED. A responsive pleading shall be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/21/11. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: denying without prejudice 13 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation to Amend Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/11.(bnbcd, )
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/17/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollander v. Zito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladius Investment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Zito
Represented By: Susan Becker Yoffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?