Brown et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Misty Brown and Mitchel Brown
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association and Robert Alan Brown
Cross_defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association and Robert Alan Brown
Cross_claimant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association and Robert Alan Brown
Case Number: 1:2011cv00517
Filed: March 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party to bear his, her, ot its own attorneys' fee and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/13/12. (jjhsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Robert Alan Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed October 6, 2011 41 is GRANTED, and all claims and causes of action asserted against Defendant Brown are dismissed by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/29/12.(jjhsl, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER striking 63 RESPONSE to Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/13/11.(jjh, ) Modified on 12/13/2011 to correct title and linkage (jjh, ).
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/2011.(kmtcd)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/21/2011. (kmtcd)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 11/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/28/11. (jjh, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 10/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/15/11. (jjh, )
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/15/2011 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/20/11. (jjh, )
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/1/2011 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/07/11. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian J. Berardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Robert Alan Brown
Represented By: Stuart Harris Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian J. Berardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Alan Brown
Represented By: Stuart Harris Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian J. Berardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Robert Alan Brown
Represented By: Stuart Harris Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Brown
Represented By: Scott R. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchel Brown
Represented By: Scott R. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?