Perkins et al v. Federal Fruit & Produce Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Perkins and Richard Miller
Defendant: Federal Fruit & Produce Company, Inc. and Michael Martelli
Case Number: 1:2011cv00542
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying 260 Motion for Sanctions, by Judge James A. Parker on 11/18/2014.(tscha, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER : In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b), a separate jury trial of Plaintiff Richard Miller's claims of damages is scheduled to begin at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, October 6, 2014 at the United States Courthouse, Courtroom #702, Denver, Colorado. By Judge James A. Parker on 9/5/2014. (trlee, )
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/21/14. Plaintiffs' oral Motion for Additional Discovery is DENIED. (lgale)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/14. Defendants' Second Motion for Additional Discovery is granted in part. Defendants may take no more than one hour of deposition testimony from Paula Greisen, no later than July 11, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any and all subsequent discovery disputes in this matter shall be addressed by counsel under my discovery dispute procedures. Violation of this Order shall result in the imposition of sanctions. (lgale)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER setting trial date and deadlines for pretrial motions: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/29/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge James A. Parker. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge James A. Parker. by Judge James A. Parker on 5/28/2014. (trlee, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE Regarding Pretrial Conference: A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/23/2014 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse, before Judge James A. Parker. Entered on 2/19/2014. (kweck)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying 227 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. by Judge James A. Parker on 1/10/2014.(trlee, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part 210 Defendants' Motion for Additional Discovery. The discovery permitted by this Order shall be completed on or before April 15, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/14.(mnfsl, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER of Reference Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge James A. Parker on 12/3/13. (mnfsl, )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's 209 Motion to Require Plaintiffs to Amend Complaing is granted in part and denied in part. By Judge James A. Parker on 12/2/13.(mnfsl, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting in part and denying in parg 211 Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct and/or amend Judgment to Conform to the Court's Post-Trial Orders. A Second Amended Judgment will be entered accordingly. By Judge James A. Parker on 11/12/13.(mnfsl, )
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER. A new trial will be held on Richard Perkins' disparate treatment claims for compensatory and punitive damages against Defendants Federal Fruit & Produce Company, Inc. and Michael Martelli. By Judge James A. Parker on 6/12/13. (mnfsl, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 AMENDED 146 JUDGMENT re: 193 Order, 194 Order. By Judge James A. Parker on 5/14/13. (mnfsl, )
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. By Judge James A. Parker on 6/22/2012. (sahsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND/OR DEPOSITIONS re: Jury Trial, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/29/2012. (wjmcd, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO SUSPENSION OF RICHARD MILLER'S CDL AND CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion in Limine. By Judge James A. Parker on 5/15/2012.(sahsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE. The DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 77 is granted in part and denied in part as provided above. Defendants request for an award of attorneys fees is denied. By Judge James A. Parker on 5/3/2012. (sahsl, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ENTRY - Courtroom Minutes for Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge James A. Parker on 4/16/2012. ORDER granting 77 Defendant's Motion in Limine to the extent set forth on the record. Judge Parker will meet with counsel on 5/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before beginning with the jury at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (lbush)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER AND NOTICE OF SETTING. The jury trial set to commence on April 23, 2012 is VACATED. This matter is reset for a eight-day jury trial with jury selection commencing at 2:00 o'clock p.m. on 5/16/2012, before Judge William J. Martinez in Court room A801 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse. Subsequent days of trial will be held before Senior Judge James A. Parker in Courtroom A601 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse beginning 5/17/2012 at 9:30 a.m. By Judge James A. Parker on 4/13/2012. (sahsl, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/12/12.(mjgsl, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings [# 15 ] is GRANTED consistent with the foregoing findings and conclusions. Otherwise, the Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings [# 15 ] is DENIED, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/22/2012.(wjcsl, )
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ENTRY for Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/18/2011; taking under advisement 42 Motion to Compel. The Court will issue a written order in due course. Dispositive Motions deadline is extended, sua sponte, to 1/9/2012. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand 29 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/29/2011.(sah, )
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/6/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 4/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/11. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins et al v. Federal Fruit & Produce Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Perkins
Represented By: Reid Jason Elkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Reid Jason Elkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Fruit & Produce Company, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Fontelle Keimig
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Martelli
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Represented By: Emily Fontelle Keimig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?