Fowler et al v. Evercare Hospice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Fowler and Lyssa Towl
Defendant: Evercare Hospice, Inc., Ovations, Inc., OptumHealth, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc. and United Health Group, Inc.
Interested_party: USA
Consol_plaintiff: Sharlene Rice
Case Number: 1:2011cv00642
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER. ORDERED that Relators Fowler's and Towl's Motion to Determine Relators' Share of Settlement Proceeds 175 is granted in part. ORDERED that $3.6 million, 20 percent of the settlement in this case, shall be awarded to relators pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730. ORDERED that this case is closed. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/07/17. (jhawk, )
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/28/15. Experts due by 4/8/2016; Rebuttal experts due by 9/8/2016; Fact and expert discovery due by 12/31/2016; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/31/2017; and A Final Pretrial Conference is se t for 3/24/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared and submitted no later than seven days before the conference. A Word version of the proposed order will be submitted concurrently with its filing to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (bsimm, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss the Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by defendant Evercare Hospice, Inc. 67 is DENIED. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Relators' Second Amended Qui Tam Complaint filed by defendants Evercare Hospice, Inc., Ovations, Inc., and OptumHealth Holdings, LLC 101 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/21/15.(jhawk, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Response to Relators' Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit A, "Motion to Dismiss Relators' Second Amended Qui Tam Complaint," of [#97] as of this date, March 23, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/23/15.(jhawk, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/17/15. (bsimm, )
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss Relators' Amended Qui Tam Complaint 68 is DENIED as moot by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/25/15.(jhawk, )
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/24/14 re: Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference 42 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2014, is vacated and reset to 2/24/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before 2/17/2015. (bsimm, )
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Maintain Level 2 Restriction on Certain Pleadings. ORDERED that Docket Nos. 24, 30, and 33 in Case No. 11-cv-00642-PAB-BNB and Docket No. 2 in Case No. 14-cv-01647-PAB shall be restricted under Level 2 Restriction until further order of this Court by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/04/14.(jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler et al v. Evercare Hospice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Fowler
Represented By: Richard C. LaFond
Represented By: Michael S. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyssa Towl
Represented By: Richard C. LaFond
Represented By: Michael S. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercare Hospice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumHealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: USA
Represented By: Marcy Elizabeth Cook(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Sharlene Rice
Represented By: James F. Barger, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Marie Gaumond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?