National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Buczynski

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Gregory S. Buczynski
Case Number: 1:2011cv00739
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment 10 filed 8/17/2011, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/24/2012.(sah, )
June 1, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER RE: AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting in part 17 Motion for Default Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/1/12.(mjgsl, )
March 28, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 6/15/2011 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/28/11. (lsw, )
June 1, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. The Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 9/1/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/1/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Buczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Katherine A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Buczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.