Righthaven LLC v. BuzzFeed, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: BuzzFeed, Inc., Jonah Peretti and Gavon Laessig
Case Number: 1:2011cv00811
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2011 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER re: 22 Response to Order to Show Cause. In light of Righthaven's representation that it intends to appeal the decision underlying the Order to Show Cause entered in this case, this case shall be stayed until 10/27/2011. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/11/11. (mnfsl, )
October 8, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 21 by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC why Summary Judgment should not enter against it in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f)(3). Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2011. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/27/11. (mnfsl, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Steven George Ganim terminated. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/12/11.(mnfsl, )
September 11, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC, Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ganim, Steven)
August 26, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Anne Barrett on behalf of BuzzFeed, Inc., Jonah Peretti (Barrett, Kathryn)
August 21, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shawn Anthony Mangano on behalf of Righthaven LLC (Mangano, Shawn)
August 18, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven George Ganim (Ganim, Steven)
June 28, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven George Ganim (Ganim, Steven)
June 23, 2011 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended 5 by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC, Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. (Ganim, Steven) Modified on 6/24/2011 to delete duplicate text and create linkage (wjc, ).
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. This case is STAYED pending my resolution of the Motion to Dismiss in Civil Case Number 1:11-cv-00830, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/19/2011. (wjc, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant BuzzFeed, Inc... (Korneffel, Peter)
May 16, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM and Class Action Counterclaim against Righthaven LLC by Jonah Peretti, BuzzFeed, Inc..(Korneffel, Peter)
May 11, 2011 Filing 10 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Jonah Peretti answer due 5/16/2011 pursuant to 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Jonah Peretti to Respond to Complaint. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjcsl, )
May 11, 2011 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Jonah Peretti. (Rothman, Kathryn)
May 10, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Jonah Peretti served on 4/21/2011, answer due 5/12/2011. (Ganim, Steven)
April 25, 2011 Filing 7 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: BuzzFeed, Inc. answer due 5/16/2011 pursuant to 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Buzzfeed, Inc., to Respond to Complaint filed 04/25/2011. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant BuzzFeed, Inc. to Respond to 1 Complaint by Defendant BuzzFeed, Inc. (Rothman, Kathryn) Modified on 4/26/2011 to create linkage (wjc, ).
April 5, 2011 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC.. (Ganim, Steven)
April 4, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. BuzzFeed, Inc. served on 4/4/2011, answer due 4/25/2011. (Ganim, Steven)
March 31, 2011 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re Assignment of Righthaven LLC Copyright Infringement Cases by Clerk (lyg, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (lyg, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against BuzzFeed, Inc., Gavon Laessig, and Jonah Peretti (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 36462) Summons Issued, filed by Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Receipt)(lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. BuzzFeed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Steven George Ganim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BuzzFeed, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn R. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah Peretti
Represented By: Kathryn R. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavon Laessig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?