Chytka v. Wright Tree Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Chytka
Defendant: Wright Tree Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00968
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER Denying 487 plaintiff's motion to the court in opposition, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/19/2015.(evana, )
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER denying 469 Motion in opposition to Strike I the Pro Se Plaintiff having to pay Attorney Fees, granting in part and denying in part 473 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, denying 474 Motion in opposition to Strike Defendant's Motion for I the Pro Se Plaintiff having to pay Attorney Fees, and denying 476 Plaintiffs Motion In Opposition To Strike the Defendants MotionTo Have I the Pro Se Plaintiff Pay Attorney Fees. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/21/2015. (cpear)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER denying 481 Motion to Reopen Case ; denying 482 Motion to Reopen Case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/21/2015.(mlace, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting 449 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena for Appearance as a Witness at Trial. The subpoena served on Bryan E. Kuhn and addressed in his motion 449 is QUASHED, and Bryan E. Kuhn is EXCUSED and RELEASED from that subpoena. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/8/2014.(alowe )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENAS: The 446 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and/or for Protective Order is GRANTED. Any individual named in a witness subpoena issued by or on behalf of the plaintiff purporting to compel that individual to be present for the trial of this case and/or to testify at trial is EXCUSED AND RELEASED from that subpoena. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/5/2014.(alowe)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER: STRIKING 435 , 436 , and 441 . That pursuant to the extant Order [#367] entered February 18, 2014, the plaintiff MAY CALL only herself as a witness at trial. That all relevant orders, including, but not necessarily limited to, the Final Pretrial Order 331 , are AMENDED to the limited extent necessary to facilitate and implement this Order, but are otherwise ratified and continued in full force and effect. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/2/2014. (trlee, )
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER denying the following motions: 373 , 375 , 376 , 383 , 384 , 386 , 394 , 398 , 403 , 405 , 408 , 409 , 416 , 417 , 418 , 419 , 430 , 347 , by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/25/2014.(trlee, )
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MINUTE ORDER denying 428 Motion for Summary Judgment. The deadlinefor the filing of dispositive motions was August 6, 2012. See the court's Minute Order 85 entered June 4, 2012. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/14/2014.(trlee, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/15/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 8/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set 9/8/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/14. (rebsec,)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MINUTE ORDER Denying 360 Plaintiff's Motion in petition to Chief Judge Marcia Krieger to answer I the Pro Se Plaintiffs petitions [sic] and Denying 363 Plaintiff's Motion to In petition to the Chief judge Krieger for the Judges Mix and Black burn and the Defendant/Defendants Attorneys to answer all of the Below in Exhibit form with Explanation by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/14.(lag, )
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER: Plaintiff may not present any witnesses other than herself at trial. Plaintiff may not present any exhibits at trial other than those already listed in the Final Pretrial Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/2014. (klyon, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MINUTE ORDER denying Motion to the Chief Judge Marcia Krieger to Make a Decision [# 348 ] and Plaintiff's second Motion to the Chief JudgeMarcia Krieger to Make a Decision [# 349 ] and Plaintiff's Motion to Chief Judge Marcia Krieger in Response to Magistrate Mix / and Overseeing Judge Blackburn [# 351 ]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/2014.(klyon, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER denying 332 Motion to the Court That I the Female Pro Se Plaintiff Will Be Asking for the Following Damages Fraud, Conspiracy, Civil Economic Tort Compensation Damages, Punitive Damages, and Aggravated Damages and Not Limited to These Dama ges I the Pro Se Plaintiff and My Family [H]as Had to Go Threw [sic] Because of the Defendant and the Court Judges on This Case [sic] and 338 Motion to the Court on Amount of Damages I the Pro Se Plaintiff Is Asking for the Following Damages See as Follows Now for When the Court Sets Up a Jury Trial for the Above Said Case or the Defendant Can Settle for the Plaintiff Summ[a]ry of Judgment of $2,266,806.70 [sic] and denying without prejudice 334 Motion to the Court to Amend Exhibi t List of I the Pro Se Plaintiff's on the Grounds That the Defendant's Attorney Got to Pick Out What Evidence of I the Pro Se Plaintiff Evidence That the Defendant Wanted to Allow in the Jury Trial. Magistrate [Judge] Mix Allowed the Def endant's Attorney to File I the Pro Se Plaintiff Exhibit Evidence With the Court for the Jury Trial. See as Follows [sic] and 336 Motion to Amend Witness List on the Grounds a Protection Order Is Placed on All Pro Se Plaintiff Witnesses and the Court or the Defendant Does Not Contact An[y] Witnesses. And Other Witnesses Not Listed Will Be Allowed for Rebuttal and On the Grounds That the Defendant Should Not Have the Right to Decide Who My Witnesses Should Be and Hold Witnesses Until a Later Date from I the Pro Se Plaintiff. On or before 1/23/2014, Plaintiff must file a Renewed Motion to Amend Witness List. On or before 1/30/2014, Plaintiff must file a Renewed Motion to Amend Exhibit List, along with copies of each exhibit she intends to present at trial. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/9/2014. (klyon, )
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions. The plaintiff's Appeal Notice [# 266 ] read this as a motion to expedite resolution of the motion for summary judgment or to set a trial, is DENIED. The plaintiff's Motion to the Court Judge Blackburn and Magistrate Mix... [# 268 ] is DENIED. The Plaintiff Motion in Opposition to Judge Blackburn and Mix... [# 269 ] is DENIED. The Response to Judge Blackburn's Docket No 270... [# 272 ] read as a motion, is DENIED. The Motion Chief Judge To the Court To Disqualify/Remove... [# 318 ] is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/23/2013.(klyon, )
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ORDER granting 319 Motion construed as Motion for Clarification. TheCourt clarifies as follows: (1) The Clerk's Office must handle hundreds of cases every day. Plaintiff's submission of a hard-copy document on one day that was not scanned on the electronic docket until the following day is not a ground for treason. (2) The Final Pretrial Conference remains set in this case for 11/14/2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/22/2013.(klyon, )
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MINUTE ORDER denying 312 Motion to Chief Judge Krieger ThatMagistrate Mix Should Be With Drawn From This Case and the Status ConferenceShould Be Vacated Until I the Pro Se Get the Exhibits that Show Why I the Pro SePlaintiff Charges Were Dropped A gainst the Defendant and That Magistrate MixShould Have been Conferring With You on Her Actions in this Case. 2. Motion forChief Judge Krieger to Over See This Case to Make Decision on This Case. See asFollows and 314 Motion toChief Judge Krieger , Blackburn and Magistrate Mix to Send I the Pro Se Plaintiff theExhibits the Defendant Filed With the Court That Shows Why I the Pro Se PlaintiffsCharges Were Dismissed By the Court Judges in This Case and to Reinstate I thePro Se Plaintiff Charges on This Day September 24 2013 on the Grounds the Courtand the Defendant Has Yet to Show Why the Pro Se Plaintiffs Charges WereDismissed By the Court. Send to Below Address. And to Resinstate All Charges ThatWere Dismissed Against the Defendant. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/2013.(klyon, )
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTE ORDER denying 306 Motion to Master Judge Kireger the Court Magistrate Mix Has No Right to Strick Any Motions in This Case or Have the Pre Trial for This Case. The Master Judge Is the Only One That Is Allowed to Make a Decision on This Case. From When I Put in the Motion for Master Judge Kireger to Make the Decisions on This Case. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/19/2013.(klyon, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER denying 303 Motion. The Final Pretrial Conference set for9/30/2013 at 11:00 a.m. is CONVERTED to a Status Conference. Plaintiff andcounsel for Defendant shall appear in person on 9/30/2013 at 11:00 a.m. inCourtroom C-204, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/2013.(klyon, )
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MINUTE ORDER striking Motions (docket Nos. 295 , 296 , 297 , and 298 ). By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/2013.(klyon, )
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MINUTE ORDER striking 273 Motion to the Court on How My Landlord Would Know I Was Going to Get a Court Date? By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/5/2013.(klyon, )
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER adopting 227 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The objections stated in Defendant's Objections To Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 228 ] are OVERRULED. The defendant's Motion to Dismiss Failure to Train Claim for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies [# 207 ] is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/27/2013.(klyon, )
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER: The Plaintiff's Response for Reconsideration on All Charges...[# 229 ] filed April 17, 2013, is DENIED; the Plaintiffs Motion to the Court To Make a Decision on Summery [sic] of Judgment or a Jury Trial [# 243 ] filed June 13, 2013, is DE NIED; the Plaintiff Motion Under Rule D.C.Colo.LCivR 56.1 Summary Judgment... [# 246 ] filed July 1, 2013, is DENIED; the Motion To The Court Under the Freedom of Information Act...[# 256 ] filed July 18, 2013, is DENIED; the [Second] Motion To The C ourt Under the Freedom of Information Act... [# 257 ] filed July 18. 2013, is DENIED; the Motion for Magistrate Mix and Judge Blackburn To Reconsideration...[# 258 ] filed July 18, 2013, is DENIED; the Motion To Master Judge Krieger... [# 260 ] filed July 30, 2013, is DENIED; and the Motion To The Court Under the Freedom of Information Act...[# 261 ] filed July 30. 2013, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/2013.(klyon, )
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ORDER: 251 Motion to the Court to Release Exhibit Evidence AND 252 Motion to the Court for the Defendant to Show Evidence are STRICKEN for failureto comply with Local Rule 7.1A. Defendant shall send to Plaintiff copies of allexhibits filed in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [# 115 ], its Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [# 128 ], and its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies [# 207 ]. Defendant shall file a certificate of service on the electronic docket within 10 business days certifying that it hascomplied with this order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/12/2013. (klyon, )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ORDER striking 238 Plaintiff's untitled Motion for Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/3/13.(mjgsl, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 234 Plaintiff's untitled Motion for Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/15/2013.(klyon, )
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER striking 231 Motion to the Court for Answer to the Plaintiffs Motions and Responses, and If the Court Is Going to Allow the Me the Female Plaintiff My Summery of Judgment to End This Case or Is the Court Goingto Allow the Female Plain tiff a Jury Trial. Sense the Plaintiff Has Not Gotten an Answer from the Defendant. 2. And Is the Court Going to Allow the Female Plaintiff the Reconsideration on All Charges That the Female Plaintiff Put In Against the Defendant [sic]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/30/2013.(klyon, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying 223 Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/3/13. (kfinn, )
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER striking 220 Motion for Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/13. (kfinn, )
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 216 Motion for Order and 217 Motion for Order are STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/2013.(klmcd, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 212 Motion to Strike the Defendants Motion to Dismiss Failure to Train Claim for Failure to Exhust Administrative Remedies.2. To Motion for a Jury Trial [sic] is DENIED AS MOOT but will be considered in connections with a Recommendation on the Motion to Dismiss. 213 Second Motion to Strike is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1A, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/19/2013.(klmcd, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER striking 209 Motion for Discovery. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a hard copy of the Court's Minute Order 206 to Plaintiff at the address listed on the electronic docket. Defendant's Motion 207 addresses whether the Co urt has subject matter jurisdiction over the remaining claim in this action. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2013 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. It shall be reset, if necessary, after final disposition of Defendant's Motion 207 . Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendant's Motion 207 on or before 4/4/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 204 Motion to Clarify is STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/11/2013.(klmcd, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER striking 191 Motion for Order; striking 199 Motion for Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/13. (kfinn, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Any objections stated by the plaintiff in documents [#156, #157, #158, #160, & #161] are OVERRULED; the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 146 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court; plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 81 is DENIED; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 115 is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/15/2013. (kfinn, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER. Motions [180, 181, 182] are STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/17/13. (kfinn, )
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER striking 171 Motion for Order; striking 173 Motion for Order; striking 176 Motion for Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the e-mail address provided by Plaintiff so that Plaintiff will receive electronic notification of filings in this matter at her e-mail account. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/4/13. (kfinn, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER; 162 Motion for Order, 163 Motion for Order, 164 Motion for Ruling, 165 Motion for Leave and 166 Motion for Order are STICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/2012.(klmcd, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER striking 154 Motion to the Court to Not Deny Plaintiff Charges Against the Defendant. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/27/12. (kfinn, )
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER striking 151 Motion to the Court for Court to Show the Plaintiff the Court Is Not Prejudice to Make Judgement in Plaintiff Favor for Her Summery of Judgement Against the Defendant. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/12. (kfinn, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER striking 148 Motion to the Court for Court to Make Judgement in Plaintiff Favor for Her Summery of Judgement Against the Defendant and Allow Plaintiff Use of 2" Binder Information She Filed With the Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/19/12. (kfinn, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER; Plaintiff's 144 Motion to the Court Not to Strick My Book Of Summery of Judge Ment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2012.(klmcd, )
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER; This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's re: filed by Kathleen Chytka, Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgment 141 and the 142 Conventionally Submitted Material accompanying the Supplement. It is hereby ORDERED that the Supplement 141 and conventionally submitted materials 142 are STRICKEN as untimely. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file any additional briefs or materials in connection with her Motion for Summary Judgment 81 or 115 . The per iod for briefing and submitting evidence has CLOSED. Briefs, evidence or other materials in contravention of this Order will be summarily stricken. The Court will issue a ruling on the Motions for Summary Judgment in the future. The Court declines to provide a date as to when those rulings will issue, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/31/2012. (klmcd, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 138 Motion to Clarify on Why the Court Denied Plaintiff's Summary Judgment and is Delaying the Plaintiff's Summary Judgment in Her Favor is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/2012.(klmcd, )
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER; Defendant's 130 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 9/27/2012 Filing is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Sur-reply 129 is STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/24/2012.(klmcd, )
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 132 Motion to the Court for Answer to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment [Motion] is DENIED. A ruling will issue on Plaintiff's pending Motion for Summary Judgment in due course, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/2012.(klmcd, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall change the designation of Docket No. 118 from a Motion to a Response to Docket No. 115 . Motion # 120 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is GRANTED to the extent that pages 1-20 and the exhibits on pages 45-58 of Docket No. 118 are not stricken. It is DENIED to the extent that the Court STRIKES pages 21-43 of Docket No. 118 . Motion # 122 is DENIED as moot, as the Court has already granted Defendant's request for an extension of tim e and Defendant has since filed the relevant document. See [# 109 , # 111 ]. Motion # 124 , which appears to be another motion for summary judgment by Plaintiff, is STRICKEN as untimely. Defendant shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [# 115 ] on or before 09/24/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/30/2012.(wjcsl, )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER denying 112 Notice of Motion and Motion by Plaintiff for Compel of Points and Authorities Declaration of the Plaintiff Pro Se. The time for discovery in this matter has closed and may only be re-opened by motion for good cause. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/13/12.(mjgsl, )
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER denying 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; striking 96 second motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 81 no later than August 7, 2012, unless Plaintiff chooses to withdraw her pending Motion for Summary Judgment before that time. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/3/12.(mjgsl, )
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER denying 94 Motion; striking 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 98 Motion to Compel. If Plaintiff chooses, she may file a Motion to Withdraw her first Motion for Summary Judgment 81 and separately submit a new Motion for Summary Judgment that does not exceed the District Judge's twenty-page limitation, so long as she does so no later than August 6, 2012 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/27/12.(mjgsl, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER striking 86 Motion to Compel and striking 87 Motion to Court for Recording Any Other Depositions and Strike the First One. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/5/12.(mjgsl, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER striking 74 Motion; striking 76 Motion to Appoint Counsel; striking 77 Motion; striking 78 Motion; striking 79 Motion; and granting 83 Motion to Amend. The Discovery Deadline is extended to July 5, 2012 for the so le purpose of taking Plaintiff's deposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, sua sponte, that the Dispositive Motions Deadline is extended to August 6, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/12.(mjgsl, ) Modified on 6/4/2012 to add "Minute" (mjgsl, ).
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER striking 68 Motion to add Xcel in on this law suit, striking 69 Motion to add Xcel for access to documents and to answer my questions, and 70 Motion to the Court to Subpoena Jim Downin and Adam Pena and Lois to Court, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/17/12.(mjgsl, )
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery; denying 64 Motion for Discovery; and denying 65 Motion for Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/25/12.(mjgsl, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/23/2012; Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw 55 Motion for 30(6)(B)(sic) is GRANTED. Docket No. 55 is deemed WITHDRAWN. Defendant's oral Motion to compel production of daily log is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall produce a copy of her daily log to Defendant's attorney on or before 4/30/2012. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Defendants Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served on Defendant 47 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Order 50 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/2012.(sah, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs letter, filed by the Clerks Office as aMotion to Amend 43 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.L.CivR 7.1A. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/9/2012.(sah, )
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 38 Motion to Amend, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/30/2011.(wjc, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motions No. 26 , 29 , 30 and 33 are denied with prejudice, and Motion Nos. 28 and 32 are denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/1/2011.(sah, ) (Main Document 36 replaced on 12/1/2011) (gmssl, ). Modified on 12/1/2011 to attach the correct pdf. (gmssl, ).
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling/Planning Conference and Related Case Deadlines 15 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2011 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated and RESET to 10/27/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/17/2011.(sah, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 8 and Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling/Planning Conference and Related Case Deadlines 9 are GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is extended to 6/27/2011. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2011 at 10:30 is vacated and RESET to 8/29/2011 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/8/2011.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chytka v. Wright Tree Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Chytka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Tree Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?