Lutalo v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ojore N. Lutalo
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, James Bullerwell, II, James (I) Bullerwell, II and Leninova Faydo
Case Number: 1:2011cv00974
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER of Dismissal. The Stipulated Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice [# 147 ] is GRANTED. Any pending motion is DENIED AS MOOT. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/2013. (klyon, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER concerning 48 and [53 Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 48 ] is TERMINATED on the docket of this case as moot. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 53 ] is TERMINATED on the docket of this case as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/2013.(klyon, )
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part 96 Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence and to Strike. Defendants shall file an affidavit in support of the award of fees and costs in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3B. on or before April 5, 2013. Plaintiff may respond on or before April 12, 2013. No reply will be permitted. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/13. (kfinn, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/13. (kfinn, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER granting 109 Motion for Leave To File Plaintiff's Supplemental Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/13. (kfinn, )
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 THIRD TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/12/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 5/13/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/24/12. (rebsec, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Motion to Vacate Trial Preparation Conference and Trial Dates. The Trial Preparation Conference set for September 21, 2012, and the jury trial set to commence October 15, 2012, are VACATED and are CONTINUED pending further order of court. Telephonic Setting Conference set for 8/24/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn to reset the Final Pretrial Conference. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/12 (mjgsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Fourth Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/8/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/12.(mjgsl, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/21/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Six (6) day Jury Trial set for 10/15/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/12. (rebsec, )
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting 57 Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 05/18/2012 and the jury trial set to commence 06/04/2012 are VACATED and are CONTINUED pending further order of court. Telephonic setting conference for 4/18/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/06/2012.(wjcsl, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Court accepts Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [# 60 -1] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 04/13/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/04/2012.(wjcsl, )
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER. The parties Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Disclose Expert Witnesses 39 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/31/2011.(sah, )
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/2011. (klmcd )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/4/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/16/11. (rebsec, )
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 12 Motion for a More Definite Statement. Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint in accordance with this Order by 5/25/2011, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/17/11.(lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutalo v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ojore N. Lutalo
Represented By: Richard Henry Rosenstock
Represented By: Francisco Eugenio Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bullerwell, II
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Bullerwell, II
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leninova Faydo
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?