Brown v. FlexTronics USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randolph V. Brown, Sr.
Defendant: FlexTronics USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01117
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re: 68 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Granting 57 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/25/2013. (eseam)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/13.(dkals, )
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute ORDER granting 40 Motion for Conference Call. ORDERED that Plaintiff may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference on 9/24/12 at 9:30 a.m. by dialing the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/13/12.(lygsl, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. ORDERED that the obligation stated in the 22 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. ORDERED sua sponte that the deadline for completion of service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 is extended up to and incl uding 8/17/12. ORDERED that, if appropriate, the Clerk shall attempt to obtain a waiver of service from Defendant. ORDERED that, if the Clerk is unable to obtain a waiver of service, the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint 8 ,summons, order granting leaveto proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, and all other orders upon Defendant, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/18/12. (lygsl, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/2012. (agarc, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return)(sah, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/15/2011. (sah2, )
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days from the dtae of this order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/24/11. (lsw, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/2/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. FlexTronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph V. Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FlexTronics USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?