Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc. v. Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc.
Defendant: J. Scott Laudenslauger and Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc.
Counter_claimant: J. Scott Laudenslauger and Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01123
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 94 Defendants' Motion to Unseal the Settlement Agreement to allow the Defendants to file a copy of the Settlement Agreement; denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. The Court grants in part D efendants' Motion to Unseal the Settlement Agreement to allow the Defendants to file a copy of the Settlement Agreement redacting the amount of payment, which is to remain confidential consistent with this Order. They may file the redacted versi on of the agreement, terming it "Redacted Copy of Exhibit A to Docket 76 , Defendants' Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement." As the copy of the Material Terms of Settlement Agreement currently on file (Docket # 76 , Exhibit A) is unredacted, it will remain sealed. The Court further denies in part Defendants' motion to the extent Defendants seek an award of attorney's fees, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/28/2012.(wjc, ) Modified on 3/1/2012 to correct the filed date (wjc, ).
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Joint Motion for Order for Administrative Closure. Pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 41.2, the Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case subject to reopening for good cause, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/2011.(wjc, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss All Plead Claims and Counterclaims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and the Parties' Settlement Agreement By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/11. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all of defendants' claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice.(jjpsl, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/28/2011. (mehcd)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Defendants' request in the Stipulated Motion for Adoption of Protective Order 61 , Defendants' Motion for the Adoption of the Protective Order from Suit One 57 is withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/26/2011. (mehcd)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING A HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16. A hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for 9/13/2011 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/13/11. (mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc. v. Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Scott Laudenslauger
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: J. Scott Laudenslauger
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Concrete Sidewalk Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Luis Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Concrete Cutting, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Luis Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?