Nalette et al v. Intrawest ULC et al
Plaintiff: Sean Nalette and James Curran
Defendant: Intrawest ULC and Fortress Investment Group
Case Number: 1:2011cv01178
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Motion 37 is GRANTED. The claims of Sean Nalette and James Curran are dismissed with prejudice. Because a collective action was never certified and the attempt to opt in by other instructors was not accepted, the dismissal does not compromi se or otherwise affect the claims of any other individual. Motion 26 is DENIED AS MOOT. Motion 60 is DENIED. Final judgment will enter dismissing this civil action as indicated above. Given the circumstances, the Court declines to award costs. Each party will bear his and its own costs and attorneys fees. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/29/2012.(sahsl, )
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 42 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/12.(lsw, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay. Discovery is STAYED until further Order of Court. Dismissal Paper due by 2/17/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/12.(lsw, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/12/2011. (mjwcd)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/24/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalette et al v. Intrawest ULC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Nalette
Represented By: Jennifer Ali Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Curran
Represented By: Jennifer Ali Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrawest ULC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?