Mendenhall v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael L. Mendenhall |
Defendant: |
Bankers Life and Casualty Company and CNO Financial Group, Inc |
Counter_claimant: |
Bankers Life and Casualty Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Michael L. Mendenhall |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv01203 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Martinez |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 17, 2014 |
Filing
99
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., against Plaintiff Michael L. Mendenhall. The Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 93 is ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defen dants' Motion for Summary Judgment 86 is GRANTED. On April 16, 2014, Bankers Life filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaims, voluntarily dismissing its counterclaims without prejudice. Accordingly, all claims asserted in this ac tion have been dismissed and Final Judgment is entered for Defendants and against Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are awarded their costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of Court within fourteen days' entry of Final Judgment, by Deborah Hansen, Deputy Clerk. (dhans, )
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
97
ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 93 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 86 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion for Forthwith Termination of Summary Judgment and Dismissal Without Prejudice ECF No. 94 is DENIED as MOOT; and This case remains pending as to Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Companys Counterclaim against the Plaintiff ECF No. 12 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/9/2014.(evana, )
|
May 17, 2013 |
Filing
74
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's "Motion for Scheduling Dates" (Doc. No. 72 , filed May 17, 2013) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the Courtroom Minutes from the Status Conference held on March 1, 2013 (Doc. No. 61 ). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/17/13. (alvsl)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
47
ORDER re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Status Report filed by CNO Financial Group, Inc, Bankers Life and Casualty Company; The Plaintiff shall file his own status report on or before May 11, 2012 complying with the courts order directing the p arties to set forth their proposals for continuation of this civil case and further proposed scheduling of responsive pleadings and discover"; Status Report due by 5/11/2012; Status Conference set for 5/15/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya; Plaintiff, or his case manager, shall arrange for his participation via telephone and shall call (303) 335-2780 at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/27/2012. (ervsl, )
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/2/2011 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/10/11. (lsw, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?