Bolsa Resources, Inc. v. AGC Resource, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bolsa Resources, Inc.
Defendant: Foundation Markets, Inc., Arizona-Alpaca Resource Corp., SOGC Resource Corp., JNS Mineral Holding Corp., Jeremy Goldman, Stephen B. Doppler, Frederik W. Warnaars, Adam Szweras, Yannis Banks, AGC Resource, Inc., Alpaca Resources, Inc., International American Resource, Inc., Martin Resources, Inc., Salzburg Holdings, LLC and David Stafford Johnson
Case Number: 1:2011cv01293
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 318 Report and Recommendations, and granting in part and denying in part 310 Motion for Default Judgment, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/14.(dkals, )
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Opinion and ORDER Sustaining Objections and Granting in Part and Denying In Part Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant MRI. Bolsa's Objections (# 312 ) are SUSTAINED IN PART and the Court DECLINES TO ADOPT the Recommendation (# 311 ). Bolsa's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (# 300 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. Default judgment consistent with this Order shall enter contemporaneously. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/25/2013.(klyon, )
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS SEVENTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF: Defendant David Stafford Johnson's Motion to Dismiss Seventh Claim for Relief 129 IS DENIED. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/24/12.(msksec, )
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 148 Alpaca Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Alpaca Defendants shall file their Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims no later than 04/05/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/03/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER granting 171 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/30/2012.(wjc, )
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Defendants Frederik Warnaars and International American Resources, Inc.'s 49 Motion to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint is DENIED. Defendant David Stafford Johnson's 50 Motion to Dismiss GRANTED IN PART A ND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted as to the First and Second Claims for relief asserted against Mr. Johnson, which are hereby stayed and shall be arbitrated in accordance with the parties' agreement. The motion is denied as to the remaini ng claims. Defendant Jeremy Goldman's 52 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) is GRANTED. The claims asserted against Mr. Goldman are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/20/2011.(wjc, )
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 120 Unopposed Motion of Defendant AGC Resource Corp. to Modify Protective Order. Paragraph 10 of the Protective Order in this action shall be modified, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/16/2011.(wjc, )
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/29/11. (msksec, )
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting 56 Motion for Order. Discovery due by 2/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2012. For further information, please see attached minutes. (FTR: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/16/2011. (kmtcd)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/24/2011 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/21/2011. (wjc, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 joint Motion and Stipulation to Amend Complaint and Set Abbreviated Period to Respond to Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The 44 Amended Verified Complaint and Jury Demand is accepted as filed, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/12/2011.(wjc, )
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/24/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/27/11. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolsa Resources, Inc. v. AGC Resource, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona-Alpaca Resource Corp.
Represented By: David R. Hammond
Represented By: Natalie Elizabeth West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOGC Resource Corp.
Represented By: David R. Hammond
Represented By: Natalie Elizabeth West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNS Mineral Holding Corp.
Represented By: David R. Hammond
Represented By: Natalie Elizabeth West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen B. Doppler
Represented By: T. J Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederik W. Warnaars
Represented By: Samuel L. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Szweras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yannis Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Resource, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Elizabeth West
Represented By: David R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpaca Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International American Resource, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel L. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salzburg Holdings, LLC
Represented By: T. J Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stafford Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Represented By: Kevin David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolsa Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Fritz William Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?