Shipley v. Harrison School District No. 2 In The County of El Paso, State of Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Donna L. Shipley
Defendant: Harrison School District No. 2 In The County of El Paso, State of Colorado, F. (I) Mike Miles and F. Mike Miles
Case Number: 1:2011cv01355
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The jury trial set for 2/11/13 at 8:00 AM is vacated. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/7/13. (mnfsl, )
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Seven-day Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/18/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/6/12. (mnfsl, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2012, denying 31 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Medical Records Related to Emotional Distress Damages. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/14/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipley v. Harrison School District No. 2 In The County of El Paso, State of Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Shipley
Represented By: Sharyn E. Dreyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison School District No. 2 In The County of El Paso, State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. (I) Mike Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Mike Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?