Romero v. Dayton-Hudson Corporation
Plaintiff: Florence M. Romero
Defendant: Dayton-Hudson Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv01362
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear her/its own costs and attorney fees by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/02/12. (jjhsl, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Deadline for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure. Defendant shall disclose the report of Wallace Larson, M.D. on or before 1/23/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/18/2012. (mehcd)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 23 Plaintiff's Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Disclosures, and denying without prejudice 26 the Stipulated Motion to Modify Deadlines for Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/7/2011. (mehcd)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/11. (jjh, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 the Stipulated Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Date of Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference reset for 2/3/2012 at 8:30 AM in the United States Courthouse, 212, N. Wahsatch, Colorado Springs, Colorado, before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/3/2011. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Dayton-Hudson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence M. Romero
Represented By: Mickey Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton-Hudson Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Smiley
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?