February 27, 2013 |
Filing
162
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 161 Order. By Clerk on 2/27/13. (mnfsl, )
|
February 26, 2013 |
Filing
161
ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 160 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Robert Dodson's 146 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss is granted. All claims against defendant Dodson are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Robert Dodson's 127 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 which requests sanctions in the form of dismissal, is denied as moot. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status will be denied for the purpose of appeal. This case is closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/26/13.(mnfsl, )
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
156
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on Amendment. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/5/12.(mnfsl, )
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing
149
ORDER. The 87 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Amend and Re-instate is denied. The 132 Motion for Status on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Reinstate Defendants (Doc. #39) is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/14/12.(mnfsl, )
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing
148
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 133 Motion to Review Phone Conference Held on October 28, 2011 Between Judge Tafoya, Defendant Attorney Kennedy, and Plaintiff and Plaintiff's 134 Motion to Review Phone Conference Held on May 11, 2012, Between Judge Tafoya, Defendant Attorney Johnson, and Plaintiff are denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/28/12.(mnfsl, ) Modified on 8/29/2012 to correct text (mnfsl, ).
|
May 18, 2012 |
Filing
130
ORDER ACCEPTING 108 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Birt's 51 Motion to Dismiss is granted and the claims against defendant Allen Birt are dismissed in their entirety. Any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status will be denied for the purpose of appeal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/18/12.(mnfsl, ) Modified on 5/18/2012 to add appeal text (mnfsl, ).
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
126
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/2012. (kmtcd)
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
117
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/8/12 denying 113 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. (pabcd)
|
May 3, 2012 |
Filing
115
MINUTE ORDER granting in part 110 Motion for Clerk to Accept Filing. Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant Dodson's First Set of Interrogatoriesand Documents 99 is construed as a motion for protective order and the Clerk is directed to correct the docket to reflect it as such. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/12.(pabcd)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting 71 Defendant Birt's Motion for Protective Order. All discovery and deadlines in this matter are stayed as to Defendant Birt. Defendant Birt file a status report no later than five days after the District Court's ruling on his motion to dismiss to advise if any portion of the case remains pending against him. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/24/12.(mnfsl, )
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
106
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Clarify Plaintiff's Motions That Have Been Stricken is granted in part. Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Information Regarding Filing Subpoenas is granted in part. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/23/12.(mnfsl, )
|
April 6, 2012 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting 103 Defendant Dodson's Motion to Allow Deposition of Plaintiff Glenn McMinn Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2). Defendant Dodson is hereby permitted to take the deposition of Plaintiff Glenn McMinn at the Crowley County Correctional Facility at a mutually convenient date and time for the facility and defense counsel. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/6/12.(mnfsl, )
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
69
MINUTE ORDER granting in part 63 Motion for Registry of Actions on Above Matter, and Status of Defendants [sic] Response to Document #39. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/13/11.(mnfsl, )
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing
62
MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend Defendants [sic] Name. The caption shall be amended to substitute Defendant "Al (John Doe), last name unknown at this time), employed as truck driver by Bent County Recycling" with Defendant "Allen Birt." By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/2/11.(mnfsl, )
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing
57
MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Motion to Postponed Ruling on Defendants Dismissal Motion. Motion 54 is construed as a motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant Birt's Motion to Dismiss no later than 12/27/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/28/2011.(jjpsl, )
|
October 21, 2011 |
Filing
43
Minute ORDER granting 41 letter/motion to the court filed October 19, 2011. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff copies of Docket Numbers 33 through 40, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/11.(lygsl, )
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
38
MINUTE ORDER granting 32 , 35 Plaintiff's letters, construed by this court as motions for clarification. Plaintiff inquires into the service of Defendant AL (John Doe). The United States Marshal cannot serve an unknown defendant. Therefore, if Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims against Defendant AL John Doe, he must identify that person by name and provide an address at which the defendant can be served. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/5/11.(mnfsl, )
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/4/2011. (kmtcd)
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
30
MINUTE ORDER denying 23 Motion to Release Names of Possible Defendants for this Civil Action. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/19/11.(mnfsl, )
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
17
ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Instate Defendants. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/12/11.(mnf, )
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/5/11. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return, # 2 Certified Mail Receipt)(mnf, )
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants C.C.A. (Corrections Corporation of America) and Bent County Recycling are dismissed as parties to this action for the reasons set forth above. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/3/2011. (sah, )
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/20/11. (lyg, )
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/15/11. (lyg, )
|