Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) et al
Plaintiff: Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Shaun Donovan, Sandra Henriquez and Deborah Lalancette
Case Number: 1:2011cv01516
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:4101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying 90 Plaintiffs motion to alter or amend the judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/3/2015.(evana, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DOCKET TRANSCRIPTS IN REFERENCED CASES: Clerk is directed to docket transcripts of all coordinated proceedings in each of the referenced actions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 71 Defendants motion for scheduling order; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall restore the amount of $112,631 to Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity for all Indian Housing Block Grant (IHBG) funds that were illegally recaptured for 23 units in Projects NM99B040011and NM99B040013 for FYs 2006 through 2008; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment providing relief to the Plaintiff as set forth above and awarding the Plaintiff its costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/13/2014.(evana, )
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the defendants shall restore to Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity all Indian Housing Block Grant funds that it has recaptured for twenty-three units located in housing projects known as NM99B040011 (Project 11) and P roject NM99B040013 (Project 13)and one unit located in the housing project known as NM99B040017 (Project 17); the Defendants shall refrain from threatening recapture of funding associated with those units and shall not act upon any threatened recaptu re; that on or before April 15, 2014, Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity shall submit a proposed form of judgment, specifying the amounts to be paid to it and the asserted sources of the payment; that if Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity clai ms entitlement to payment for underfunding because HUD excluded those units from its FCAS in a particular year, the proposed form of judgment should include a separate itemization for those amounts, which may be submitted by May 15, 2014. An Appendix may be provided to explain the calculation of the amount owed and the record support for the claim. The Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs will be addressed after entry of judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2014. (rpmcd)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Relief Requested, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/27/2013.(ervsl, )
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Relief Requested and Motion to Supplement the Record: Plaintiff shall file its Reply Brief on or before September 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013.(rpmcd)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Accept Late-Filed Brief 57 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/8/2013.(rpmcd )
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Motion re 49 Order: Plaintiff shall file its Statement of Relief Requested on or before March 4, 2013 and Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Statement of Relief Requested on or before May 6, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/26/2012. (rpmcd)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 48 : On or before December 19, 2012, simultaneous briefs shall be filed by the plaintiffs and defendants in the coordinated cases addressing factual and legal questions pertaining to HUD's authority to reca pture funds awarded in a previous grant year that the grant recipient spent on affordable housing activities. On or before January 18, 2013, plaintiffs in each case shall file a statement of the relief requested and the court's jurisdiction und er the APA to grant such relief. Proposed supplements to the administrative record may be tendered. Defendants' responses to the plaintiffs' statements are due on or before March 19, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2012. (rpmcd )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON ISSUES PRESENTED IN THE SPECIAL BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF NAMBE PUELBO HOUSING ENTITY, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/4/2012. (rpmcd)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Memorandum Opinion and Order filed August 31, 2012, in Fort Peck Housing Authority v. HUD et al., Civil Action No. 05-cv-00018-RPM, is hereby incorporated as an order governing common i ssues in this action; it is FURTHER ORDERED that a coordinated hearing will be held at a time to be scheduled for the purpose of addressing procedures for determining issues remaining in this action. All counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/31/2012. (rpmcd )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR COORDINATED HEARING: will held at a time to be scheduled and all counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2012. (rpmcd)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 17 , is denied. (FTR: K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re: 35 Motion. Court shall receive as evidence in consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction: [17-1], [29-3], [18-1], [18-2] and [35-1] (see Order), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/20/2012.(rpmcd)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/30/2011 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. onSeptember 22, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/16/2011. (rpmcd)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Discharging re: 5 Order to Show Cause. A scheduling conference for this case will be convened after the defendants file their answer and the administrative record, expected by August 12, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/22/2011. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD)
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Donovan
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Henriquez
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lalancette
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?