February 3, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER Denying 90 Plaintiffs motion to alter or amend the judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/3/2015.(evana, )
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DOCKET TRANSCRIPTS IN REFERENCED CASES: Clerk is directed to docket transcripts of all coordinated proceedings in each of the referenced actions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER denying 71 Defendants motion for scheduling order; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall restore the amount of $112,631 to Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity for all Indian Housing Block Grant (IHBG) funds that were illegally recaptured for 23 units in Projects NM99B040011and NM99B040013 for FYs 2006 through 2008; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment providing relief to the Plaintiff as set forth above and awarding the Plaintiff its costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/13/2014.(evana, )
|
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the defendants shall restore to Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity all Indian Housing Block Grant funds that it has recaptured for twenty-three units located in housing projects known as NM99B040011 (Project 11) and P roject NM99B040013 (Project 13)and one unit located in the housing project known as NM99B040017 (Project 17); the Defendants shall refrain from threatening recapture of funding associated with those units and shall not act upon any threatened recaptu re; that on or before April 15, 2014, Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity shall submit a proposed form of judgment, specifying the amounts to be paid to it and the asserted sources of the payment; that if Plaintiff Nambe Pueblo Housing Entity clai ms entitlement to payment for underfunding because HUD excluded those units from its FCAS in a particular year, the proposed form of judgment should include a separate itemization for those amounts, which may be submitted by May 15, 2014. An Appendix may be provided to explain the calculation of the amount owed and the record support for the claim. The Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs will be addressed after entry of judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2014. (rpmcd)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER granting 65 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Relief Requested, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/27/2013.(ervsl, )
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Relief Requested and Motion to Supplement the Record: Plaintiff shall file its Reply Brief on or before September 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013.(rpmcd)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER Granting 58 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Accept Late-Filed Brief 57 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/8/2013.(rpmcd )
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing
53
ORDER Granting 52 Motion re 49 Order: Plaintiff shall file its Statement of Relief Requested on or before March 4, 2013 and Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Statement of Relief Requested on or before May 6, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/26/2012. (rpmcd)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 48 : On or before December 19, 2012, simultaneous briefs shall be filed by the plaintiffs and defendants in the coordinated cases addressing factual and legal questions pertaining to HUD's authority to reca pture funds awarded in a previous grant year that the grant recipient spent on affordable housing activities. On or before January 18, 2013, plaintiffs in each case shall file a statement of the relief requested and the court's jurisdiction und er the APA to grant such relief. Proposed supplements to the administrative record may be tendered. Defendants' responses to the plaintiffs' statements are due on or before March 19, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2012. (rpmcd )
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON ISSUES PRESENTED IN THE SPECIAL BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF NAMBE PUELBO HOUSING ENTITY, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/4/2012. (rpmcd)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER REGARDING INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Memorandum Opinion and Order filed August 31, 2012, in Fort Peck Housing Authority v. HUD et al., Civil Action No. 05-cv-00018-RPM, is hereby incorporated as an order governing common i ssues in this action; it is FURTHER ORDERED that a coordinated hearing will be held at a time to be scheduled for the purpose of addressing procedures for determining issues remaining in this action. All counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/31/2012. (rpmcd )
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER FOR COORDINATED HEARING: will held at a time to be scheduled and all counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2012. (rpmcd)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
37
Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 17 , is denied. (FTR: K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
|
January 20, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER re: 35 Motion. Court shall receive as evidence in consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction: [17-1], [29-3], [18-1], [18-2] and [35-1] (see Order), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/20/2012.(rpmcd)
|
August 16, 2011 |
Filing
16
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/30/2011 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. onSeptember 22, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/16/2011. (rpmcd)
|
July 22, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDER Discharging re: 5 Order to Show Cause. A scheduling conference for this case will be convened after the defendants file their answer and the administrative record, expected by August 12, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/22/2011. (rpmcd)
|