Cook v. Vinyard et al
Plaintiff: |
Susan M. Cook |
Defendant: |
Jeffrey Vinyard and 4SR SPIFF, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv01541 |
Filed: |
June 13, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine M. Arguello |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael E. Hegarty |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 31 the Joint Motion to Approve Collective Action Settlement; the Court will maintain jurisdiction over this action until the terms of the settlement agreement are fully executed. Pursuant to the Court's authority under D.C. Col o. LCivR 41.2, this case shall be administratively closed during the pendency of the execution period of the settlement agreement. On or before December 1, 2012, the case may be reopened by motion of an party showing good cause. If, on or before December 1, 2012, no party files a motion to reopen the case or moves to extend the deadline, the case shall be dismissed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2012. (mehcd)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
44
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Status Conference set for 9/7/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/4/2012. (mehcd)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
28
MINUTE ORDER granting 26 the Parties' (third) Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Defendnats shall respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests by 12/8/2011. Plaintiff shall move for certification of a class pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act by 12/12/2011. All other deadlines remain the same. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2011. (mehcd)
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
24
MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests on or before 12/1/2011, and Plaintiff shall move for certification of a class pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act on or before December 12/5/2011. All other deadlines remain the same. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/11.(mnfsl, )
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing
21
MINUTE ORDER granting 19 the Parties' Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests on or before November 11, 2011, and Plaintiff shall move for certification of a class pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act on or before November 10, 2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/11/2011. (mehcd)
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
17
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2011. (mehcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?