Martinez v. City of Colorado Springs et al
Plaintiff: Jarrott Martinez
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs, Sydney Huffman and Michael Jelmo
Case Number: 1:2011cv01556
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Partial Dismissal With Prejudice 49 1/13/2012, APPROVED. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice 50 filed 1/13/2012, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/7/2012, and the jury trial set to commence 9/24/2012, are VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/17/2012. (sahsl, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUPPLEMENT TO STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, Supplement to 37 , entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2011. (mjwcd)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Authorization to Release Documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/11/2011.(mjwcd)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/13/2011. (mjwcd)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/7/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Fifteen (15) day Jury Trial set for 9/24/2012 08:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/25/11. (rebsec, )
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Oral Argument / Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2011.Granting 20 Motion to Stay. These proceedings as to defendant Huffman are stayed. Status Report by defendant Huffman due by 10/1/2011 and the first working day of each month thereafter. Fact Discovery due by 5/1/2012; Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2012. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 9/1/2011 is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/24/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/18/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2011.(mjwcd)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. City of Colorado Springs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrott Martinez
Represented By: Jordan D. Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Represented By: Shane Matthew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Huffman
Represented By: Shane Matthew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jelmo
Represented By: Shane Matthew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?