Air Methods Corporation v. OPEIU et al
Plaintiff: Air Methods Corporation
Defendant: OPEIU and OPEIU Local 109
Case Number: 1:2011cv01570
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 52 Motion for Contempt by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/15.(jdyne, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of OPEIU, OPEIU Local 109 against Air Methods Corporation re: 36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. By Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 09/28/12. (alvsl)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/15/2011. (kmtcd)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendants Motion for Leave to Participate in Scheduling and Planning Conference by Telephone by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2011.(erv, )
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/20/2011. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air Methods Corporation v. OPEIU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Methods Corporation
Represented By: Edward John Butler
Represented By: Raymond Myles Deeny
Represented By: Patrick Richard Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPEIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPEIU Local 109
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?