Trust Department of First National Bank of Santa Fe et al v. Burton Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Aimee R Melendy, Amanda F. Melendy, Trust Department of First National Bank of Santa Fe, The, Richard Quanz, Stephen Melendy, Lawrence Melendy, Judy Melendy and Christopher W. Melendy
Defendant: Burton Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01629
Filed: June 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims [# 207 ] filed May 6, 2014, is APPROVED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/6/2014. (klyon, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: By May 2, 2014, the parties SHALL FILE a joint status report apprising the court of the current state of the case and all matters relevant to the final settlement and dismissal of the claims herein. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2014. (klyon, )
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE ORDER striking 190 Defendant The Burton Corporations Rule60(B) Motion For Amendment of Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/15/2013.(klyon, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re: Defendant The Burton Corporation's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Defendant The Burton Corporation's 173 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is granted in part and denied in part. On 9/25/2013, at 10:00 a.m. (MDT), the court SHALLCONDUCT a telephonic setting hearing conference to reset this matter for TrialPreparation Conference and trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/2013.(klyon, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2013. 179 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION to Reopen Discovery is DENIED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding custody of trial exhibits by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/30/12. (rebcd)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND INTERVENING PLAINTIFF TO BIFURCATE CLAIMS AND ISSUES PRESENTED BY THE INTERVENING PLAINTIFF. Order granting 122 Motion to Bifurcate. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/10/12.(mjgsl, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT THE BURTON CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO THE TRACE 0.5 YOUTH HELMET RECALL. The motion 99 is GRANTED with respect to evidence regarding the recall of defenda nt's Trace 0.5 Youth helmet. The motion is in all other respects DENIED. Plaintiffs are PRECLUDED for now from referring to or offering in evidence before the jury matters relating to the recall of the Trace 0.5 Youth helmet unless of by way proper impeachment or pending further order of court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/12.(mjgsl, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 81 Burton Corporation's Motion to Strike the Testimony and Opinions of Richard Stalnaker Under Fed. R. Evid. 702 and denying as moot 89 Motion to Strike the Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant The Burton Corporations Motion To Strike the Testimony and Opinions of Richard Stalnaker Under Fed. R. Evid. 702. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/13/12.(mjgsl, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER denying 92 Plaintiffs' Motion For Permission To File a Surreply To Defendant The Burton Corporation's Motion To Strike The Testimony and Opinions of Richard Stalnaker, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/22/12.(mjgsl, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2012. The court shall GRANT IN PART and DENIED IN PART 77 defendant's Amended MOTION for Sanctions. The defendant shall submit a bill of costs which reflects the attorneys fees and costs incurred in connection with the to the previous hearing (Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on January 18, 2012) before Magistrate Judge Shaffer regarding deficient discovery. The defendant shall als o be allowed to submit a bill of costs for that hearing. The defendant shall be permitted to submit a bill of costs in connection to the filing of the motion for sanctions as well as for today's hearing. As a further sanction, defense counsel may reopen the depositions of Mr. Seth Bayger and Dr. Richard Stalnaker. Those depositions may be reopened for a period of two (2) hours each. The costs of those depositions including reasonable attorney's fees for attending the deposition and the cost of the court reporter shall be incurred by the plaintiff. These depositions shall take place at defense counsels office. The court shall not enter an order limiting or excluding the scope of the witnesses opinions. To the extend defense counsel would like to supplement his client's expert opinion, in light of those supplemental depositions, they shall be free to do so. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Stipulation For Dismissal of Certain Claims For Relief. Plaintiffs' Fifth, Eighth, Ninth and Tenth Causes of Action in the Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/16/12.(mjgsl, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/14/11. (cbssec)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERNECE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Fifteen (15) day Jury Trial set for 8/6/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/6/11. (rebsec, )
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/6/2011 at 10:00 a.m., by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/11/11. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trust Department of First National Bank of Santa Fe et al v. Burton Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee R Melendy
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda F. Melendy
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trust Department of First National Bank of Santa Fe, The
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Quanz
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Melendy
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Melendy
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Melendy
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Melendy
Represented By: Craig Thomas Watrous
Represented By: Jerrald Joseph Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton Co. Inc.
Represented By: Brett Marshall Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?