U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Flint-McClung Capital LLC et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Flint-McClung Capital LLC and Shawon McClung
Case Number: 1:2011cv01644
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 07:0001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER of Preliminary Injunction and for Other Equitable Relief Against Defendants by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/7/2011. (See Order for Details)(erv, )
September 23, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/11. (bnbcd, )
September 30, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Holding Defendant Shawon McClung in Civil Contempt re: 25 Order to Show Cause, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/30/2011. (erv, )
October 5, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendant Shawon McClungs Motion for Further Communication Going Forward for All Court Documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall email a copy of this Order, as well as a copy of this Courts Order Holding Defendant Shawon McClung In Civil Contempt 32 , which is still in effect, to Defendant Shawon McClung at shmcclun@gmail.com. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Contempt Order #32)(erv, )
February 28, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION,CIVIL PENALTIES AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF AGAINSTDEFENDANTS FLINT-McCLUNG CAPITAL LLC AND SHAWON McCLUNG granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/28/2012.(jjpsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Flint-McClung Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Alison Brooke Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint-McClung Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawon McClung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.