January 14, 2014 |
Filing
279
AMENDED ORDER. Defendant is ordered to file with this Court a response to that motion on or before Tuesday, January 21, 2014. That response should address, among other things, whether this Court has jurisdiction to consider Plaintiffs motion by Judge David M. Ebel on 01/14/14.(jjhsl, )
|
October 8, 2013 |
Filing
273
MINUTE ORDER granting 271 the Joint Motion to Amend the Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/8/2013.(ervsl, )
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
269
MINUTE ORDER granting 267 Motion to Vacate Motion Hearing by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/20/13.(jjhsl, )
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing
263
MINUTE ORDER granting 261 Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference 8/22/2013 03:00 PM is vacated. Motion Hearing remains set on that date and time. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/2013.(mjwcd)
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing
258
ORDER granting 253 Motion for Leave to Modify the Final Pretrial Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/06/13w.(jjhsl, )
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
257
ORDER granting 249 Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Trial Preparation Conference for 8/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge David M. Ebel by Judge David M. Ebel on 08/05/13.(jjhsl, ) Modified on to correct linkage 8/6/2013 (jjhsl, ).
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing
237
MINUTE ORDER granting 235 Motion for Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference shall be held before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on August 20, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/18/13.(jjhsl, )
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
229
ORDER Denying Jury Demand by Judge David M. Ebel on 05/21/13. (jjhsl, )
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
223
MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the pro se Plaintiff's Motion to Request Action Pursuant to 28 USC § 636(e) 215 is denied without prejudice by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/01/13.(jjhsl, )
|
April 29, 2013 |
Filing
221
MINUTE ORDER re: 213 Motion to Request Restricted Access to Video Footage Lefted [sic]. As represented by defense counsel, the Bureau of Prisons will coordinate with the court to enable the videos to be shown at trial if necessary by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/29/13.(jjhsl, )
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
218
ORDER denying 212 Reconsideration by Judge David M. Ebel on 04/23/13.(jjhsl, )
|
April 4, 2013 |
Filing
205
MINUTE ORDER granting 203 Motion to Correct Case Caption by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/04/13.(jjhsl, )
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
198
ORDER Adopting and in Part, Rejecting in Part the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. The magistrate judge's report and recommendation 186 is, thus, ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. Freeman's motion for summary judgment 151 is DENIED in full. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 129 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court grants Freeman's "Motion to Show Cause" 195 . The Court requests that the magistrate judge set a final pretrial conference and conduct such other proceedings and enter such other orders as may be appropriate, consistent with this Order by Judge David M. Ebel on 03/28/13.(jjhsl, )
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
185
MINUTE ORDER granting 183 Motion to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 USC § 1915. Plaintiff need not make a filing fee payment for the month of December 2012 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/13/12.(jjhsl, )
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting 172 Motion for Leave; 173 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an additional fifteen days to file his reply, and that reply may be no more than fifteen pages in length, by Judge David M. Ebel on 10/9/12.(lygsl, )
|
September 11, 2012 |
Filing
155
Minute ORDER granting 153 Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/11/12.(lygsl, )
|
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
146
Minute ORDER granting 144 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Strike, Without Prejudice, "Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion" 135 . "Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion" 135 is stricken from the record. Plaintiff shall have up to 9/13/12 to file a new motion for summary judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/17/12.(lygsl, )
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing
142
Minute ORDER granting 137 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 129) Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 56(c). ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion to Request and Order Entered Concerning Material Restricted from Plaintiffs Possession by Order (Doc. 69) Sent to the United States District Court 138 is denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/12.(lygsl, )
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing
126
ORDER denying 122 Motion for Reconsideration,as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/27/2012.(mjwcd)
|
July 11, 2012 |
Filing
118
Minute Order. ORDERED that the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Request In Camera Review Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(e) 114 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion Compel Discovery Material Pursu ant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 100 is DENIED. ORDERED that the BOP Staff shall, within 15 days, make those documents that are subject to the Protective Order 69 and not to be Retained by Inmate available for further review by the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/11/12.(lygsl, )
|
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
111
MINUTE ORDER denying 109 Plaintiff's Motion to Make Inquiry into Order by the Court as to the Status of Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/25/12.(gmssl, )
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
98
Minute ORDER granting in part 96 Plaintiff's Motion to Request More Interrogatories Pursuant to Rule 33 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to the Defendants. Plaintiff, shall be permitted to serve a total of 10 additional interrogatories, including subparts, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/8/12.(lygsl, )
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
93
Minute ORDER granting 88 89 Motions for Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/3/12.(lygsl, )
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing
85
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs Notice and Request for Continuance ofthe Proceeding 80 is denied as moot. The plaintiffs letter regarding retaliation and denial of legal property and documents 83 is granted in part and denied in part. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/12/2012.(sah, )
|
February 9, 2012 |
Filing
79
Minute ORDER granting 77 MOTION to Address the Court Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rules of Discovery 34, Depositions 30 (d)(1), and Interrogatories 28, 30, and 32 to the extent that the plaintiff may make an inquiry concerning these matters at the Status Conference set for 4/2/12 at 9:00 a.m, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/9/12.(lygsl, )
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting 70 Motion for Order Permitting Deposition of Federal Bureau of Prisons Inmate Freeman, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/31/2012.(mjwcd)
|
January 26, 2012 |
Filing
69
PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/26/2012. (mjwcd)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing
61
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 1/23/2012. Withdrawing 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Oppose the Protective Order filed by the Defendants. The moti on 55 is deemed a RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order 57 . Reply deadline 2/2/2012. Discovery due by 6/22/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2012. Status Conference set for 4/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 bef ore Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
|
January 3, 2012 |
Filing
53
MINUTE ORDER. The Plaintiffs two Motions for Leave to Amend the Records 44 and 45 are denied for the reasons stated in the defendants Response (Docket No. 52). The Plaintiffs Revised Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 34 36 is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated in the defendants Response (Docket No. 51). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/2012.(sah, )
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 1/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/13/2011. (sah, )
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Second Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 34 31 is denied as premature. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2011.(sah, )
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
22
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 34 20 is denied as premature. Defendants have not even been served yet in this action. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/21/2011.(sah, )
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
19
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel 10 is denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs letter motion requesting to have the summons issued on all parties/defendants 17 is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/19/2011.(sah, )
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER ASSIGNING CASE. This case shall be assigned to Judge David M. Ebel pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/2/2011. (sah, )
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/27/11. (lyg, )
|